Bey v. Gascon et al

Plaintiff: Jamil Bey
Defendant: George Gascon, Amador Brenneman, Charlene Padovani Kiesselbach, Vicki L. Hennessey, Teressa M. Caffese, Eugene S. Lee, Malinka Jones, Frances Yokota and Braden Woods
Case Number: 3:2019cv03184
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William H Orrick
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; by Jamil Bey. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS OF JAMIL MALIK BEY IN SUPPORT OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; by Jamil Bey. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 9/10/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/12/2019. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/29/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (jmdS, COURT STAFF).
June 11, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE; by Jamil Bey (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
June 11, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing; filed by Jamil Bey. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/12/2019: #1 Proposed Order) (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 06/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service, #2 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ivaS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE REGARDING RESOURCES AVAILABLE TO PRO SE LITIGANTS. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on June 7, 2019. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/3/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/10/2019 at 1:30 PM. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Assignment of Case to a United states Magistrate Judge for Trial) (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jamil Bey. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order; Request for Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction, filed by Jamil Bey. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 CLAIM FOR DAMAGES & INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants. Filed byJamil Bey. Consent/Declination due by 6/21/2019. IFP Pending. No Process. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibits B - J, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2019).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bey v. Gascon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Gascon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amador Brenneman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlene Padovani Kiesselbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicki L. Hennessey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teressa M. Caffese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene S. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malinka Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frances Yokota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Braden Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamil Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?