Agasino v. American Airlines Inc.
Plaintiff: Ismael Agasino
Defendant: American Airlines Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv03243
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #12 MOTION TO DISMISS OR TRANSFER. As set forth in the attached order, the court denies American Airlines's motion to dismiss but grants its motion to transfer and transfers this case to the Northern District of Texas.(ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 26, 2019 Case electronically transferred to the Northern District of Texas as case number 4:19-cv-00584. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2019) Modified on 7/29/2019 (fabS, COURT STAFF).
July 24, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY (re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant American Airlines, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint ) Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to the Motion to Dismiss filed byAmerican Airlines Inc.. (Smith, Michael) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 18, 2019 Filing 19 Declaration of Michael L. Smith in Support of #12 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant American Airlines, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Declaration of Michael L. Smith in Support of Motion to Dismiss Defendanat American Airlines, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed byAmerican Airlines Inc.. (Related document(s) #12 ) (Smith, Michael) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER. The defendant appears to have attached as exhibit 1 to its motion to dismiss documents relating to a medical examination of another individual unrelated to this case. ECF No. 12-1 at 411. The court exercises its inherent authority to seal ECF No. 12-1. See United States v. Mann, 829 F.2d 849, 853 (9th Cir. 1987) (court has inherent power to seal filings); Kamakana v. City and Cty. of Honolulu, 447 F.3d 1172, 1179 (9th Cir. 2006) (recognizing that "the public has less of a need for access to court records...'unrelated, or only tangentially related, to the underlying cause of action'"). The court directs the defendant to refile ECF No. 12-1 with the medical documents removed. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on July 18, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
July 17, 2019 Filing 17 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant American Airlines, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint ) filed byIsmael Agasino. (McKay, John) (Filed on 7/17/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 16 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by American Airlines Inc... (Smith, Michael) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 11, 2019 Filing 15 CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 7/18/2019. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2019)
July 3, 2019 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING MOTION HEARING: According to Local Rule 7, motions must be noticed for a hearing not less than 35 days from filing. Due to the recent filing of #12 Motion to Dismiss Defendant American Airlines, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, the court sets the hearing for 8/8/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco. All other deadlines in the briefing schedule remain in effect. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2019)
July 3, 2019 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 7/10/2019. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2019)
July 3, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant American Airlines, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by American Airlines Inc.. Responses due by 7/17/2019. Replies due by 7/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael) (Filed on 7/3/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 9/12/2019 is reset to 10/10/2019 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 10/3/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 26, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ismael Agasino.. (McKay, John) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 7/9/2019. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (McKay, John) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ismael Agasino. American Airlines Inc. served on 6/13/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. (McKay, John) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ismael Agasino (McKay, John) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to American Airlines Inc.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/5/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/12/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/24/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (McKay, John) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against American Airlines Inc. (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-13421688.). Filed by Ismael Agasino. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (McKay, John) (Filed on 6/10/2019) Modified on 6/11/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Agasino v. American Airlines Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Airlines Inc.
Represented By: Michael Lloyd Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ismael Agasino
Represented By: John Douglas McKay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?