Express Mobile, Inc. v. e-Zest Solutions, Inc.
Plaintiff: Express Mobile, Inc.
Defendant: e-Zest Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv03351
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Referring Judge: Donna M Ryu
2 Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Filing 37 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice filed by Express Mobile, Inc.. (Craft, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/15/2019)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 1/9/2020 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 1/2/2020. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/12/19. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2019)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #36 . *** STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 1/9/2020 AT 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 1/2/2020. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/12/19. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2019) Modified on 11/12/2019 (clS, COURT STAFF).
November 8, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION to Continue Stay and Notice of Settlement filed by Express Mobile, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Craft, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/8/2019)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #32 Motion to Stay all Deadlines. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2019)
October 8, 2019 Filing 32 Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement filed by Express Mobile, Inc.. Responses due by 10/22/2019. Replies due by 10/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Craft, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Claims Construction Hearing set for 5/13/2020 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/12/19. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 12, 2019 Filing 30 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard Seeborg: Initial Case Management Conference held on 9/12/2019. Court to issue scheduling order.Total Time in Court: 20 minutes. Not Reported or Recorded. Plaintiff Attorney: Jeffrey Craft, Timothy Devlin - Telephonic.Defendant Attorney: Bailey Watkins, Neil Jones, William Overend, Lauren Deeb, Michael McNamara, Kevin Meek, Mike Adams - Telephonic. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/12/2019)
September 9, 2019 Filing 29 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint filed by Express Mobile, Inc.. (Craft, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/9/2019)
September 5, 2019 Filing 28 Certificate of Interested Entities by e-Zest Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent e-Zest Solutions Ltd. for e-Zest Solutions, Inc.. (Guske, Sarah) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
September 5, 2019 Filing 27 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Express Mobile, Inc.. (Craft, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Notice of Reference and ORDER Re: Discovery Procedures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 8/30/2019. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2019)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #24 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Timothy Devlin. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2019)
August 30, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Timothy Devlin ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13663536.) filed by Express Mobile, Inc.. (Craft, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/30/2019)
August 22, 2019 Filing 23 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Craft, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/22/2019)
August 22, 2019 Filing 22 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Guske, Sarah) (Filed on 8/22/2019)
August 19, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu for Discovery. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Discovery purposes. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/16/19. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2019)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Lauren Jarvis Dreyer. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2019)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Bailey Preston Morgan Watkins. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2019)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Kevin James Meek. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2019)
August 6, 2019 Set/Reset Hearing Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/12/2019 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2019)
July 30, 2019 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE RE REASSIGNED CASE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled a Telephonic Case Management Conference before Judge Richard Seeborg upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Seeborg's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. All parties shall appear telephonically and must contact Court Conference at 866/582-6878 at least one week prior to the Conference. Case Management Statement due by 9/5/2019. Case Management Conference set for 9/12/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Chambers. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2019) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2019)
July 30, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13564078.) filed by e-Zest Solutions, Inc.. (Lauren, Dreyer) (Filed on 7/30/2019)
July 30, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13564019.) filed by e-Zest Solutions, Inc.. (Watkins, Bailey) (Filed on 7/30/2019)
July 30, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13563964.) filed by e-Zest Solutions, Inc.. (Meek, Kevin) (Filed on 7/30/2019)
July 30, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Richard Seeborg. Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers no longer assigned to the case. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2019)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RELATING CASE(s): C-17-2605 RS; C-19-3350 JSW; C-19-3351 YGR; C-19-3352 RS; C-19-3353 JST; C-19-3355 EJD; C-19-3356 EMC and C-19-3357 JST... Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/26/2019. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by e-Zest Solutions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A & B)(Guske, Sarah) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah JoAnn Guske (Guske, Sarah) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION REGARDING EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT #9 by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (ygrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2019)
July 4, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT filed by Express Mobile, Inc. and e-Zest Solutions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Craft, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/4/2019) Modified on 7/5/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Express Mobile, Inc... (Craft, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Express Mobile, Inc.. e-Zest Solutions, Inc. served on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/11/2019. (Craft, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 9/9/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/16/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to e-Zest Solutions, Inc.. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding US 6,546,397 B1; US 7,594,168 B2; US 9,471,287 B2; US 9,928,044 B2 (cc: form mailed to register). (Craft, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Craft, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against e-Zest Solutions, Inc. with jury demand. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13433634.). Filed by Express Mobile, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Craft, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/13/2019) Modified on 6/13/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Express Mobile, Inc. v. e-Zest Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: e-Zest Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Dreyer Lauren
Represented By: Kevin James Meek
Represented By: Sarah JoAnn Guske
Represented By: Bailey Preston Morgan Watkins
Represented By: Lauren Jarvis Dreyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Express Mobile, Inc.
Represented By: Seth Wesley Wiener
Represented By: Jeffrey Francis Craft
Represented By: Timothy Devlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?