Express Mobile, Inc. v. Phase2 Technology LLC
Plaintiff: Express Mobile, Inc.
Defendant: Phase2 Technology LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv03353
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE You are notified that the Court has scheduled a Telephonic Case Management Conference before Judge Richard Seeborg upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Seeborg's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. All parties shall appear telephonically and must contact Court Conference at 866/582-6878 at least one week prior to the Conference. Case Management Statement due by 9/5/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/12/2019 at 11:00 AM to be held telephonically in San Francisco, Chambers. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2019)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Michael McNamara. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2019)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Judge Jon S. Tigar no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 7/31/19. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2019)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER RELATING CASE(s): C-17-2605 RS; C-19-3350 JSW; C-19-3351 YGR; C-19-3352 RS; C-19-3353 JST; C-19-3355 EJD; C-19-3356 EMC and C-19-3357 JST... Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/26/2019. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
July 29, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael McNamara, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971- 13560490) filed by Phase2 Technology LLC. (Kwan, Adrian) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
July 25, 2019 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference previously set for 10/21/2019 has been continued. Case Management Statement due by 11/11/2019 by 5:00 PM. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/18/2019 2:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2019)
July 17, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER re Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Phase2 Technology LLC. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order Granting Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint)(Kwan, Adrian) (Filed on 7/17/2019)
July 17, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Adrian Kwan - Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Kwan, Adrian) (Filed on 7/17/2019)
July 11, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Express Mobile, Inc.. Phase2 Technology LLC served on 6/24/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Craft, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/11/2019)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO FILE NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF OTHER ACTION INVOLVING SAME PATENT. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 3, 2019. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERNECE. Case Management Statement due by 10/14/2019 by 5:00 PM. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/21/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 6/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Express Mobile, Inc... (Craft, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Phase2 Technology LLC. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/4/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/11/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/27/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding patent infringement - US 6,546,397 B1; US 7,594,168 B2 (cc: form mailed to register). (Craft, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Craft, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement; Demand for Jury Trial against Defendant Phase2 Technology LLC, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-13433770). Filed by Express Mobile, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Craft, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/13/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Express Mobile, Inc. v. Phase2 Technology LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Express Mobile, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Francis Craft
Represented By: Seth Wesley Wiener
Represented By: Timothy Devlin
Represented By: Robert Dean Kiddie, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phase2 Technology LLC
Represented By: Michael T Renaud
Represented By: Michael McNamara
Represented By: Adrian Kwan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?