Express Mobile, Inc. v. R2I Holdings, LLC
Plaintiff: Express Mobile, Inc.
Defendant: R2I Holdings, LLC d/b/a R2 Integrated and R2I Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv03355
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE RE REASSIGNED CASE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled a Telephonic Case Management Conference before Judge Richard Seeborg upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Seeborg's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. All parties shall appear telephonically and must contact Court Conference at 866/582-6878 at least one week prior to the Conference. Case Management Statement due by 9/5/2019. Case Management Conference set for 9/12/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Chambers. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2019)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings re #15 Order Relating Case. Judge Edward J. Davila no longer assigned to case. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER RELATING CASE(s): C-17-2605 RS; C-19-3350 JSW; C-19-3351 YGR; C-19-3352 RS; C-19-3353 JST; C-19-3355 EJD; C-19-3356 EMC and C-19-3357 JST... Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/26/2019. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order Granting #13 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila.(ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2019)
July 11, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Unopposed Request to Extend Time For Defendant to Respond to Complaint filed by Express Mobile, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Craft, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/11/2019)
June 27, 2019 Filing 12 (Text Only) CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/7/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/17/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before the Hon. Edward J. Davila. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 6/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Express Mobile, Inc... (Craft, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Express Mobile, Inc.. R2I Holdings, LLC served on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/11/2019. (Craft, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to R2I Holdings, LLC. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Patent (cc: form mailed to register). (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/10/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/17/2019 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/27/2019. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding US 6,546,397 B1; US 7,594,168 B2 (cc: form mailed to register). (Craft, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Craft, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against R2I Holdings, LLC d/b/a R2 Integrated ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13433802.). Filed byExpress Mobile, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Craft, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/13/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Express Mobile, Inc. v. R2I Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Express Mobile, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Francis Craft
Represented By: Seth Wesley Wiener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R2I Holdings, LLC d/b/a R2 Integrated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R2I Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?