Eden Environmental Citizen's Group, LLC v. Perry Tool & Research et al
Plaintiff: Eden Environmental Citizen's Group, LLC
Defendant: Kenneth Fusselman, Perry Tool & Research and Mike Fusselman
Case Number: 3:2019cv03412
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1365
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Eden Environmental Citizen's Group, LLC. Service waived by Kenneth Fusselman waiver sent on 6/19/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Herb, Hans) (Filed on 7/19/2019)
July 19, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Eden Environmental Citizen's Group, LLC. Service waived by Mike Fusselman waiver sent on 6/19/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Herb, Hans) (Filed on 7/19/2019)
July 19, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Eden Environmental Citizen's Group, LLC. Service waived by Perry Tool & Research waiver sent on 6/19/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Herb, Hans) (Filed on 7/19/2019)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/3/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 9/26/2019. Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/19/19. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 06/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/24/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/1/2019 01:30 PM. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Kenneth Fusselman, Mike Fusselman, Perry Tool & Research. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Eden Environmental Citizen's Group, LLC.. (Sinha, Xhavin) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/1/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet by Eden Environmental Citizen's Group, LLC . (Sinha, Xhavin) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Civil Cover Sheet missing re: #1 Complaint, filed by Eden Environmental Citizen's Group, LLC. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Sinha, Xhavin) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief and Civil Penalties against All Defendants with jury demand ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13439524.). Filed by Eden Environmental Citizen's Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A Notice Ltr)(Sinha, Xhavin) (Filed on 6/14/2019) Modified on 6/17/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eden Environmental Citizen's Group, LLC v. Perry Tool & Research et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eden Environmental Citizen's Group, LLC
Represented By: Xhavin Sinha
Represented By: Hans William Herb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Fusselman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Tool & Research
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Fusselman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?