Twitch Interactive, Inc. v. John and Jane Does 1 through 100
Plaintiff: Twitch Interactive, Inc.
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1 through 100 and Mason Apodaca
Case Number: 3:2019cv03418
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2020 Filing 38 REPORT on the determination of an action regarding Trademark Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER OF DISMISSAL - The case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/18/2020. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 17, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Twitch Interactive, Inc. (Simpkins, Holly) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
July 30, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Venkat Balasubramani (Balasubramani, Venkat) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
June 26, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. The correct event is Summons Returned Executed .[err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re : #34 Affidavit of Service filed by Twitch Interactive, Inc. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2020)
June 25, 2020 Filing 34 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED filed by Twitch Interactive, Inc. Mason Apodaca served on June 18, 2020, answer due 7/9/20. (Simpkins, Holly) (Filed on 6/25/2020) Modified on 6/26/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF TWITCH INTERACTIVE, INC.'S #32 EX PARTE MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINES by Judge William H. Orrick. Case Management Conference set for 8/25/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 8/18/2020. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2020)
May 26, 2020 Filing 32 Ex Parte Application to Extend Deadlines filed by Twitch Interactive, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Simpkins, Holly) (Filed on 5/26/2020)
May 14, 2020 Filing 31 Summons Issued as to Mason Apodaca. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2020)
May 13, 2020 Filing 30 Proposed Summons. (Simpkins, Holly) (Filed on 5/13/2020)
May 13, 2020 Filing 29 AMENDED COMPLAINT against John and Jane Does 1 through 100, Mason Apodaca. Filed byTwitch Interactive, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Simpkins, Holly) (Filed on 5/13/2020)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #27 Ex Parte Application. Deadline for service is extended to 6/8/2020. Case Management Statement due by 6/17/2020. Case Management Conference set for 6/23/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor.(jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2020)
March 2, 2020 Filing 27 Ex Parte Application to Extend Deadlines filed by Twitch Interactive, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Holly M. Simpkins, #2 Proposed Order)(Simpkins, Holly) (Filed on 3/2/2020)
March 2, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Doe IP Address 73.8.232.156 by Twitch Interactive, Inc. (Staniar, Lauren) (Filed on 3/2/2020)
February 20, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Doe IP Address 173.216.156.254 by Twitch Interactive, Inc. (Staniar, Lauren) (Filed on 2/20/2020)
January 16, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Doe IP Address 173.170.43.209 by Twitch Interactive, Inc. (Staniar, Lauren) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #22 Ex Parte Application for Leave to Serve Additional Third Party Subpoenas. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2019)
December 20, 2019 Filing 22 Ex Parte Application for Leave to Serve Additional Third Party Subpoenas Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference and Memorandum in Support filed by Twitch Interactive, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Holly M. Simpkins, #3 Exhibit A-C)(Simpkins, Holly) (Filed on 12/20/2019)
December 20, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Doe IP Address 73.65.112.131 by Twitch Interactive, Inc. (Staniar, Lauren) (Filed on 12/20/2019)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #19 Ex Parte Application. Case Management Statement due by 3/17/2020. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/24/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2019)
December 10, 2019 Filing 19 Ex Parte Application re #18 Order on Ex Parte Application, #16 Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11, (Ex Parte Motion to Extend Deadlines) filed by Twitch Interactive, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Holly M. Simpkins)(Staniar, Lauren) (Filed on 12/10/2019)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF TWITCH INTERACTIVE, INC.'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO EXTEND THE DEADLINE FOR SERVICE by Judge William H. Orrick granting #17 Ex Parte Application. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 17 Ex Parte Application to Extend the Deadline for Service (L. CIV. R. 7-10) filed by Twitch Interactive, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Holly M. Simpkins)(Simpkins, Holly) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF TWITCH INTERACTIVE, INC.'S #15 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RELATED DEADLINES by Judge William H. Orrick granting #15 Administrative Motion. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 12/17/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 12/10/2019. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2019)
September 3, 2019 Filing 15 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Continue Case Management Conference and Related Deadlines re #9 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, filed by Twitch Interactive, Inc.. Responses due by 9/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Holly Simpkins)(Simpkins, Holly) (Filed on 9/3/2019)
August 12, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Venkat Balasubramani (Balasubramani, Venkat) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S #12 EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE THIRD-PARTY SUBPOENAS by Judge William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2019)
June 27, 2019 Filing 12 Ex Parte Application for Leave to Serve Third Party Subpoenas Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference and Memorandum in Support filed by Twitch Interactive, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Carl Hester, #3 Declaration of Holly M. Simpkins, #4 Exhibit A-M)(Simpkins, Holly) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Holly Marie Simpkins. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Lauren Watts Staniar. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 9/10/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/17/2019 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 6/17/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility)(aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding:TRADEMARK INFRINGEMENT (cc: form mailed to register). (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibits)(aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 Case assigned to Judge William H. Orrick. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Lauren Watts Staniar)) ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13440387.) filed by Twitch Interactive, Inc. (Dugdale, Katherine) (Filed on 6/14/2019) Modified on 6/17/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Holly M. Simpkins) ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13440378.) filed by Twitch Interactive, Inc.. (Dugdale, Katherine) (Filed on 6/14/2019) Modified on 6/17/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a Trademark (cc: form mailed to register). (Dugdale, Katherine) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Twitch Interactive, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Amazon.Com Inc. for Twitch Interactive, Inc.. re #1 Complaint, (Dugdale, Katherine) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Twitch Interactive, Inc. (Dugdale, Katherine) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for (1) Federal Trademark Infringement (15 U.S.C. 1114); (2) Breach of Contract; (3) Trespass to Chattels; (4) Fraud ; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; against John and Jane Does 1 through 100 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13440056.). Filed byTwitch Interactive, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dugdale, Katherine) (Filed on 6/14/2019) Modified on 6/17/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Twitch Interactive, Inc. v. John and Jane Does 1 through 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Twitch Interactive, Inc.
Represented By: Katherine M. Dugdale
Represented By: Holly Marie Simpkins
Represented By: Lauren Watts Staniar
Represented By: Venkat Balasubramani
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Watts Staniar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1 through 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mason Apodaca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?