Roberts v. Zuora, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Casey Roberts
Defendant: Zuora, Inc., Tien Tzuo and Tyler Sloat
Case Number: 3:2019cv03422
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Casey Roberts. Service waived by Tyler Sloat waiver sent on 6/26/2019, answer due 8/26/2019; Tien Tzuo waiver sent on 6/26/2019, answer due 8/26/2019; Zuora, Inc. waiver sent on 6/26/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Portnoy, Lesley) (Filed on 8/6/2019)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Casey Roberts of Publication of SEC Class Action Notice (Rajesh, Pavithra) (Filed on 7/3/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Tyler Sloat, Tien Tzuo, Zuora, Inc.. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER SEC CLASS ACTION SEC Class Action Notice due by 7/5/2019. Case Management Statement due by 9/6/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/13/2019 02:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording, #2 Standing Order, #3 Standing Order)(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Susan Illston. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Portnoy, Lesley) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tyler Sloat, Tien Tzuo, Zuora, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13440665.). Filed byCasey Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Portnoy, Lesley) (Filed on 6/14/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts v. Zuora, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casey Roberts
Represented By: Lesley F. Portnoy
Represented By: Pavithra Rajesh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zuora, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tien Tzuo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Sloat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?