McGoey v. TransUnion, LLC et al
Plaintiff: James McGoey
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and TransUnion, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv03455
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jon S Tigar
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 27 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #1 Complaint, to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Givental, Alisa) (Filed on 8/16/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 26 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FROM 11/18/19 TO 11/12/19. Judge Tigar's Case Management Conference calendar will shift from Monday afternoons to Tuesday afternoons, therefore this case is being rescheduled consistent with the change. Case Management Statement due by 11/5/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/12/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 12, 2019 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Computershare Limited, Corporate Parent Specialized Loan Servicing Holdings, LLC for Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Goodman, Brett) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
August 12, 2019 Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Goodman, Brett) (Filed on 8/12/2019) Modified on 8/13/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
July 25, 2019 Filing 23 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference previously set for 10/21/2019 has been continued. Case Management Statement due by 11/11/2019 by 5:00 PM. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/18/2019 2:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2019)
July 16, 2019 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James McGoey. Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC served on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019. (Angelo, Joseph) (Filed on 7/16/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 21 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due 10/14/2019 by 5:00 PM. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/21/2019 2:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 07/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2019)
July 12, 2019 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2019)
July 12, 2019 Filing 18 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Initial Complaint filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and James McGoey. (Givental, Alisa) (Filed on 7/12/2019) Modified on 7/12/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
July 12, 2019 Filing 17 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by TransUnion, LLC.. (Carlton Robinson, Katherine) (Filed on 7/12/2019)
July 12, 2019 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant TransUnion, LLC shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 7/26/2019. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2019)
July 11, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint And Affirmative Defenses byTransUnion, LLC. (Carlton Robinson, Katherine) (Filed on 7/11/2019)
July 9, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, to Extend Time to Respond filed by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. and James McGoey. (Goodman, Brett) (Filed on 7/9/2019) Modified on 7/9/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
July 8, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by James McGoey.. (Angelo, Joseph) (Filed on 7/8/2019)
July 8, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 7/22/2019. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2019)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Katherine E. Carlton Robinson.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2019)
July 2, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13487005.) filed by TransUnion, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Carlton Robinson, Katherine) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by David James Streza (Streza, David) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Entities by TransUnion, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Trans Union, LLC for TransUnion, LLC. (Streza, David) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
June 26, 2019 #Electronic filing error. No title Page. Certificates/Proofs of Service e-filed separately and not as an attachment, require a title page. Please refer to Civil Local Rules 3-4 re first page requirement. No further action is necessary. Re: #6 Summons Returned Executed filed by James McGoey, #7 Summons Returned Executed filed by James McGoey (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 26, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James McGoey. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. served on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019. (Angelo, Joseph) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James McGoey. TransUnion, LLC served on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019. (Angelo, Joseph) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/24/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/1/2019 01:30 PM. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, TransUnion, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/2/2019. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Angelo, Joseph) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, TransUnion, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13446095.). Filed by James McGoey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Angelo, Joseph) (Filed on 6/18/2019) Modified on 6/18/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGoey v. TransUnion, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Brett B Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Alisa Alexandra Givental
Represented By: Mary Kate Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion, LLC
Represented By: David James Streza
Represented By: Katherine Elisabeth Carlton Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James McGoey
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Represented By: Scott Matthew Johnson
Represented By: Joseph Brian Angelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?