Johnson v. Brown et al
Plaintiff: Jam'Bri Sean Johnson, Sr.
Defendant: James J. Marchiano, Sandra L. Margulies, Robert L. Dondero, Edmund G. Brown, Jeffrey Boyarsky, Craig L. Parsons, Jim Humes, Jennifer Ow, Ross Thomas, Kamala Harris and District Court Judge Jon S. Tigar
Case Number: 3:2019cv03500
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Referring Judge: PSLC JNE
2 Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 19 Mail sent to Jam'Bri Sean Johnson returned as undeliverable re #18 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2019)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING #14 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis ON APPEAL by Judge William Alsup. The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 7/26/2019, a copy of this order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 24, 2019 Filing 17 USCA REFERRAL NOTICE as to #15 Notice of Appeal, filed by Jam'Bri Sean Johnson, Sr. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 23, 2019 Filing 16 USCA Case Number 19-16454 U.S. Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit for #15 Notice of Appeal, filed by Jam'Bri Sean Johnson, Sr. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 22, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Jam'Bri Sean Johnson, Sr. Appeal of Judgment #12 , Order Dismissing Case #11 (IFP Request was previously e-filed and granted by the Court). (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service, #2 Envelope)(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 12, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jam'Bri Sean Johnson, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2019)
July 8, 2019 Filing 13 Mail sent to Jam'bri Sean Johnson returned as undeliverable re #8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2019)
July 8, 2019 Filing 12 JUDGMENT is entered in favor of defendants. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2019)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF DISMISSAL - This case is DISMSSED for failure to state a cognizable claim for relief. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2019)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Judge William Alsup granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2019)
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 OBJECTIONS to re #4 ECF Transfer In - converted docket entry, Staff Notes by Jam'Bri Sean Johnson, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William Alsup for all further proceedings. Judge Jon S. Tigar no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by the Clerk on 6/21/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 20, 2019. The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 6/20/19, a copy of this order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 7/26/2019. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 CASE TRANSFERRED in from United States District Court for the Eastern District of California (Sacramento); Case Number 2:19-cv-01053-EFB. Original File Certified Copy of Transfer Order and Docket Sheet Received.
June 13, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order, Case Transferred Out to Another District served on Jambri Sean Johnson Sr.. (Plummer, M)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 06/13/19 CASE TRANSFERRED to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California. (Plummer, M)
June 11, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Jambri Sean Johnson, Sr.. (Kastilahn, A)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 7/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Kastilahn, A)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Jambri Sean Johnson, Sr. (Kastilahn, A) Modified on 6/12/2019 (Plummer, M).
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Jambri Sean Johnson, Sr.(Kastilahn, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Brown et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James J. Marchiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra L. Margulies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L. Dondero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edmund G. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Boyarsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig L. Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Humes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Ow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kamala Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: District Court Judge Jon S. Tigar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jam'Bri Sean Johnson, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?