White v. Sterling Infosystems, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Derek Paul White
Defendant: Sterling Infosystems, Inc. and ASAP Drug Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv03501
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/22/19. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2019)
October 21, 2019 Filing 23 STIPULATION For Voluntary Dismissal filed by Derek Paul White. (Schreiber, Christian) (Filed on 10/21/2019)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER re #21 Notice of Settlement and Request to Stay Deadlines. Case Management Statement due by 11/15/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/22/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 09/09/2019. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 5, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE by Derek Paul White of Settlement and Request to Stay Deadlines (Schreiber, Christian) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER, signed 8/27/19, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #18 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Pamela Q. Devata. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2019)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order, signed 8/27/19, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Courtney S. Stieber.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2019)
August 27, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13650848.) filed by ASAP Drug Solutions, Inc., Sterling Infosystems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificates of Good Standing)(Devata, Pamela) (Filed on 8/27/2019)
August 27, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13650845.) filed by ASAP Drug Solutions, Inc., Sterling Infosystems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Stieber, Courtney) (Filed on 8/27/2019)
August 26, 2019 Filing 16 Civil Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sterling Infosystems, Inc. (Suits, Eric) (Filed on 8/26/2019) Modified on 9/20/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
August 26, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE by ASAP Drug Solutions, Inc. Civil Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Suits, Eric) (Filed on 8/26/2019)
August 26, 2019 Filing 14 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint byASAP Drug Solutions, Inc.. (Suits, Eric) (Filed on 8/26/2019)
August 26, 2019 Filing 13 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint bySterling Infosystems, Inc.. (Suits, Eric) (Filed on 8/26/2019)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING re #11 Second Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint filed by Sterling Infosystems, Inc., ASAP Drug Solutions, Inc.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/29/19. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
July 25, 2019 Filing 11 Second Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint filed by ASAP Drug Solutions, Inc., Sterling Infosystems, Inc.. (Suits, Eric) (Filed on 7/25/2019) Modified on 7/29/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
July 15, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by ASAP Drug Solutions, Inc., Sterling Infosystems, Inc... (Suits, Eric) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING re #7 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint filed by Sterling Infosystems, Inc., ASAP Drug Solutions, Inc.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/9/19. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants Sterling Infosystems, Inc., and ASAP Drug Solutions shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 7/23/2019. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint filed by ASAP Drug Solutions, Inc., Sterling Infosystems, Inc.. (Suits, Eric) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
July 2, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 9/20/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/27/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2019)Restore deadlines terminated in error.
July 2, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Document filed in wrong case. [err401]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #6 Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignm ent PLEASE DISREGARD. POSTED IN ERROR. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 PLEASE DISREGARD. POSTED IN ERROR CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2019) Modified on 7/2/2019 (klhS, COURT STAFF).
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Derek Paul White.. (Schreiber, Christian) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to ASAP Drug Solutions, Inc., Sterling Infosystems, Inc.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/20/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/27/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/3/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages; Demand for Jury Trial against Sterling Infosystems, Inc., ASAP Drug Solutions, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-13448794.). Filed by Derek Paul White. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Schreiber, Christian) (Filed on 6/18/2019) Modified on 6/19/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Sterling Infosystems, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek Paul White
Represented By: Christian Schreiber
Represented By: Monique Olivier
Represented By: Hans Lodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sterling Infosystems, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Elihu Suits
Represented By: Pamela Quigley Devata
Represented By: Courtney Sophie Stieber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASAP Drug Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Elihu Suits
Represented By: Pamela Quigley Devata
Represented By: Courtney Sophie Stieber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?