Houston Casualty Company v. USK Manufacturing, Inc.

Plaintiff: Houston Casualty Company
Defendant: USK Manufacturing, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv03575
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal (Amended) by Houston Casualty Company (Cutbirth, Robert) (Filed on 8/9/2019)
August 9, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Declaratory Relief by Houston Casualty Company against USK Manufacturing, Inc. (No Appearance by Defendant) by Houston Casualty Company (Cutbirth, Robert) (Filed on 8/9/2019)
July 31, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 8/14/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2019)
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 7/26/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Defendant USK Manufacturing, Inc.. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/16/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/23/2019 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/5/2019. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 Amended Civil Cover Sheet filed by Houston Casualty Company (Cutbirth, Robert) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Civil Cover Sheet is not complete. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Fili ngs > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Houston Casualty Company (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Parties filed by Houston Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc. for Houston Casualty Company. (Cutbirth, Robert) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Cutbirth, Robert) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief against Defendant USK Manufacturing, Inc., (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971- 13453206). Filed by Houston Casualty Company. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Cutbirth, Robert) (Filed on 6/20/2019) Modified on 6/21/2019 (tnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Houston Casualty Company v. USK Manufacturing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USK Manufacturing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Houston Casualty Company
Represented By: Robert A. Cutbirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?