Miroyan v. Kai et al
Plaintiff: Michael Miroyan
Defendant: Kenneth Kai, Quang Hung Hang, Title GordanTee and Trust Title Co., Robert D.S. Kim, Paul Sulla, Jr., Andrew Kennedy, Michael Schluztier, Michael Carroll, Wayne Silver, Tae Kai, David Lucas and Matthew Shannon
Case Number: 3:2019cv03626
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing; filed by Michael Miroyan. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/16/2019: #1 Proposed Order) (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
August 15, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS; DECLARATION OF MICHAEL MIROYAN AND EXIBIT A; by Michael Miroyan (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 18 Amended Response to #15 Response to Order to Show Cause; byMichael Miroyan. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER ON #16 PLAINTIFF'S EMERGENCY MOTION. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/15/2019. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 9, 2019 Filing 16 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ; filed by Michael Miroyan. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2019)
August 9, 2019 Filing 15 Response to #8 Order to Show Cause, byMichael Miroyan. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2019)
July 25, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 9/11/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2019)
July 24, 2019 Filing 14 Renotice motion hearing re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed byKenneth Kai, Tae Kai. (Related document(s) #6 ) (Silver, Wayne) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 24, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Wayne Silver. Motion Hearing set for 9/11/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 8/7/2019. Replies due by 8/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Silver, Wayne) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 22, 2019 Filing 12 Case REASSIGNED to Judge William H. Orrick. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 22, 2019 Filing 11 This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #http://cand.uscourts.gov/news/225. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 22, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Michael Miroyan.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2019) (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION. Miroyan must file his response by 8/9/2019, or the Court will recommend dismissal of this lawsuit. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 7/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: All parties are requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 7/25/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Kenneth Kai, Tae Kai. Motion Hearing set for 8/28/2019 01:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Responses due by 8/1/2019. Replies due by 8/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Silver, Wayne) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Wayne Alan Silver On Behalf of TAE KAI and KENNETH KAI (Silver, Wayne) (Filed on 7/11/2019)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Wayne Alan Silver (Silver, Wayne) (Filed on 7/11/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Robert D.S. Kim. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/18/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/25/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michael Schluztier, Michael Carroll, Quang Hung Hang, Kenneth Kai, Tae Kai, Andrew Kennedy, Robert D.S. Kim, David Lucas, Matthew Shannon, Wayne Silver, Paul Sulla, Jr, Title GordanTee and Trust Title Co. (Filing fee $ 400-Paid). Filed by Michael Miroyan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D Locked Due to Personal Identifiers, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Receipt)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miroyan v. Kai et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Kai
Represented By: Wayne Alan Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quang Hung Hang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Title GordanTee and Trust Title Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert D.S. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Sulla, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Schluztier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Silver
Represented By: Wayne Alan Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tae Kai
Represented By: Wayne Alan Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Miroyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?