Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California et al v. Garrett Thompson Construction, Inc.
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California and Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California
Defendant: Garrett Thompson Construction, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv03631
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Board of Trustees of the Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California. Garrett Thompson Construction, Inc. served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Richman, Ronald) (Filed on 7/19/2019)
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Defendant Garrett Thompson Construction, Inc.. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2019)
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 Proposed Summons. (Richman, Ronald) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
June 26, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due 9/30/2019 by 5:00 PM. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/7/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 6/25/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California.. (Richman, Ronald) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/20/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/27/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet by Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California . (Richman, Ronald) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/8/2019. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 24, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect Revision of Civil Cover Sheet used. Current Revision is JS 44 (Rev. 07/18) [err101]. Please e-file an Amended Civil Cover Sheet only. Event is located at: Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet Re:[1-1] Civil Cover Sheet filed by Board of Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Breach of Collective Bargaining Agreement; to Recover Unpaid Trust Fund Contributions and for a Mandatory Injunction against Garrett Thompson Construction, Inc., (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-13459758). Filed by Board of Trustees of the Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet) (Richman, Ronald) (Filed on 6/21/2019) Modified on 6/24/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California et al v. Garrett Thompson Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Ronald Lee Richman
Represented By: Sarah Kyong-Ju Lee Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Ronald Lee Richman
Represented By: Sarah Kyong-Ju Lee Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Ronald Lee Richman
Represented By: Sarah Kyong-Ju Lee Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Ronald Lee Richman
Represented By: Sarah Kyong-Ju Lee Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garrett Thompson Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?