Totah et al v. Kone Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Anne-Marie Totah, Jayden Totah and Eric Totah
Defendant: Kone Inc., ThyssenKrupp Elevator Corporation, City and County of San Francisco, Kone Corporation and ThyssenKrupp Elevator America
Case Number: 3:2019cv03842
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Filing 15 RECEIPT OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT from San Francisco Superior Court. Re #13 Order (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2019)
August 8, 2019 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE : Sent by U.S. MAIL a certified copy of #13 Order to Remand, a certified copy of the civil docket to Superior Court in San Francisco. Re #13 Order (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/8/2019: #1 Court Return Envelope) (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO REMAND to County of San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/07/2019. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2019)
July 31, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and Proposed Order to Remand filed by Kone Corporation and Jayden Totah, et al. (Oium, Mark) (Filed on 7/31/2019) Modified on 8/1/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
July 22, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #10 Scheduling Order and Standing Orders by Kone Corporation. (Oium, Mark) (Filed on 7/22/2019) Modified on 7/23/2019 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 10/8/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 10/1/2019. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/17/2019. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2019)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 7/16/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2019)
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kone Corporation.. (Oium, Mark) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/26/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/3/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2019)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/17/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2019)
July 2, 2019 Answer to Removed Complaint (See dpcument #1 ; page 24) filed by Kone Corporation. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kone Inc. (Oium, Mark) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Kone Inc. (Oium, Mark) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Kone Inc.. (Oium, Mark) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco County Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-19-573894. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13488803). Filed byKone Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Oium, Mark) (Filed on 7/2/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Totah et al v. Kone Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne-Marie Totah
Represented By: Joseph Hoffman, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jayden Totah
Represented By: Joseph Hoffman, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Totah
Represented By: Joseph Hoffman, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kone Inc.
Represented By: Mark Edward Oium
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ThyssenKrupp Elevator Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kone Corporation
Represented By: Dana Kathryn Oium
Represented By: Mark Edward Oium
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ThyssenKrupp Elevator America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?