O'Keeffe, Inc. v. AIG Claims, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: O'Keeffe, Inc.
Defendant: AIG Specialty Insurance Company and AIG Claims, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv03861
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT ENE. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/26/19. (ec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2019)
December 19, 2019 Set/Reset Hearing ENE Hearing set for 1/8/2020 10:00 AM., at Law Offices of Michael G.W. Lee, 360 Post Street, 8th Fl., San Francisco, CA 94108. This date is pending Court approval of an anticipated stipulation to extend the ENE deadline. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2019) Modified on 12/19/2019 (af, COURT STAFF).
November 26, 2019 Filing 23 ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Michael G.W. Lee as ENE Evaluator. (ec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2019)
November 12, 2019 Filing 22 ADR Clerk's Notice Vacating Appointment of Evaluator Sanford Kingsley #21 . The ADR Unit will appoint another Evaluator as soon as possible. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2019)
November 12, 2019 Filing 21 ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Sanford Kingsley as ENE Evaluator. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2019)
October 11, 2019 Filing 20 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 12/3/2019. Close of Expert Discovery due by 8/28/2020.Close of Fact Discovery due by 6/15/2020.Case Management Statement due by 1/10/2020.Designation of Experts due by 6/29/2020.Rebuttal Reports due by 7/24/2020.Further Case Management Conference set for 1/17/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. Motion Hearing set for 9/25/2020 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/8/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. Jury Selection set for 1/19/2021 08:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Jury Trial set for 1/19/2021 08:30 AM. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/11/19. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 7, 2019 Filing 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Initial Case Management Conference held on 10/4/2019. Case referred to ADR for ENE. Close of Expert Discovery due by 8/28/2020. Close of Fact Discovery due by 6/15/2020. Case Management Statement due by 1/10/2020. Designation of Experts due by 6/29/2020. Rebuttal Reports due by 7/24/2020. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/17/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. Motion Hearing set for 9/25/2020 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/8/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. Jury Selection set for 1/19/2021 08:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Jury Trial set for 1/19/2021 08:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Jury Trial set for 1/20/2021 08:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Jury Trial set for 1/21/2021 08:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Jury Trial set for 1/25/2021 08:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Jury Trial set for 1/26/2021 08:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. FTR Time: Not Reported. Attorney for Plaintiff: Mark Schickman Attorney for Defendant: Christine Magarian(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/7/2019)
September 27, 2019 Filing 18 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT & [Proposed] Order filed by AIG Specialty Insurance Company. (Magarian, Christine) (Filed on 9/27/2019)
September 27, 2019 Filing 17 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Magarian, Christine) (Filed on 9/27/2019)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order, signed 9/20/19, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #15 Stipulation selecting Early Neutral Evaluation.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 18, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Early Neutral Evaluation by O'Keeffe, Inc. filed by O'Keeffe, Inc.. (Schickman, Mark) (Filed on 9/18/2019)
September 12, 2019 Filing 14 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Magarian, Christine) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
September 12, 2019 Filing 13 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Schickman, Mark) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
July 21, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by O'Keeffe, Inc. (Schickman, Mark) (Filed on 7/21/2019)
July 17, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by O'Keeffe, Inc... (Schickman, Mark) (Filed on 7/17/2019)
July 17, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by AIG Specialty Insurance Company.. (Magarian, Christine) (Filed on 7/17/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service by AIG Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Magarian, Christine) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/27/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/4/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2019)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT by AIG Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Magarian, Christine) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING re #5 Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant to respond to Initial Complaint filed by AIG Claims, Inc., AIG Specialty Insurance Company. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/8/19. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2019)
July 3, 2019 Answer to Removed Complaint (See Doc No. #1 -9) by AIG Specialty Insurance Company. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2019)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION Extending time for Defendant AIG Claims to Respond to Initial Complaint by Not more than 14 days re #1 Notice of Removal filed by AIG Claims, Inc., AIG Specialty Insurance Company. (Magarian, Christine) (Filed on 7/3/2019) Modified on 7/12/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AIG Claims, Inc., AIG Specialty Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Notice to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court)(Magarian, Christine) (Filed on 7/3/2019)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/17/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2019)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by AIG Claims, Inc., AIG Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc., Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty, Inc. for AIG Claims, Inc., AIG Specialty Insurance Company. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Magarian, Christine) (Filed on 7/3/2019)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Civil Action Pursuant to 28 USC Sec 1441 from San Mateo County Superior Court. Their case number is 19CIV02781. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0971-13491300). Filed by AIG Specialty Insurance Company, AIG Claims, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Civil Cover Sheet) (Magarian, Christine) (Filed on 7/3/2019) Modified on 7/12/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Keeffe, Inc. v. AIG Claims, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIG Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Christine Magarian
Represented By: John Terence Lupton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIG Claims, Inc.
Represented By: Christine Magarian
Represented By: John Terence Lupton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: O'Keeffe, Inc.
Represented By: Cathleen Sumiko Yonahara
Represented By: Mark Isaac Schickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?