Swain v. Director of Corrections
Petitioner: Darius Swain
Respondent: Director of Corrections
Case Number: 3:2019cv03882
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: PSLC CET
Referring Judge: Edward M Chen
2 Judge: PSLC MWD
3 Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 8/6/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2019)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK TO REASSIGN THIS ACTION. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 8/5/19. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2019)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Darius Swain. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Darius Swain.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
July 5, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2019)
July 5, 2019 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE: re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 8/12/2019. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2019)
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Writ of Replevin) against Director of Corrections (Filing fee IFPP). Filed by Darius Swain. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swain v. Director of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Darius Swain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?