Zayas et al v. National General Inc.
Plaintiff: Antonio Zayas and Svetlana Narbaeva
Defendant: National General Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv03952
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Svetlana Narbaeva, Antonio Zayas.. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2019)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The court dismisses the plaintiffs complaint with leave to amend. If the plaintiffs choose to file an amended complaint, they must do so by August 19, 2019. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 07/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 Proposed Summons. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 Civil Cover Sheet by Svetlana Narbaeva, Antonio Zayas. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Antonio Zayas.. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 8/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE AND ORDER: The attached notice and order notifies the plaintiff of resources available, attaches the district's handbook for litigants who do not have a lawyer, includes a flyer for contacting the court's help desk and instructs the plaintiff about serving the defendants. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 07/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service, #2 Self Help Flyer, #3 Pro Se Handbook)(ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2019)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Svetlana Narbaeva. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Antonio Zayas. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/3/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/10/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against National General Inc.. Filed byAntonio Zayas, Svetlana Narbaeva. Consent/Declination due by 7/23/2019. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zayas et al v. National General Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National General Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Zayas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Svetlana Narbaeva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?