Agim v. Rose et al
Plaintiff: Chima Agim
Defendant: Howard Rose and John McPhail
Case Number: 3:2019cv03989
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: PSLC MWD
Referring Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 case electronically transmitted to the Southern District of Texas, Houston Division. their new case number is 4:19-cv-02669, filed 7/19/2019. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2019) Modified on 7/24/2019 (tnS, COURT STAFF).
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF TRANSFER. This suit is transferred to the Southern District of Texas, Houston Division. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/16/2019. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate/Proof of Service)(jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/16/2019: #(2) Corrected Image - (Order of Transfer)) (jmdS, COURT STAFF).
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 8/19/2019. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2019)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Restraining Order ; by Chima Agim. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2019)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION OUT OF STATE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND OR A RESTRAINING ORDER FOR CAUSE; filed by Chima Agim. Responses due by 8/9/2019. Replies due by 8/23/2019. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2019)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION TO SHOW CAUSE IF NECESSARY; filed by Chima Agim. Responses due by 8/9/2019. Replies due by 8/23/2019. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2019)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SHOW CAUSE IF NECESSARY; filed by Chima Agim. Responses due by 8/9/2019. Replies due by 8/23/2019. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2019)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 Letter dated 07/03/19; from Chima Agim re Court Fees. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2019)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT: OUT OF STATE'S ADMINISTRATIVE PROCEDURE ACT CIVIL ACTION SUIT; (NO PROCESS); (IFP PENDING); against John McPhail, Howard Rose. Filed byChima Agim. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Agim v. Rose et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John McPhail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chima Agim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?