Walker v. Monsanto Company

Case Number: 3:2019cv04009
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Eastern District of Louisiana (New Orleans), 2:19-cv-11295 MLCF DMD, Walker v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 3:19-cv-04009 VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 140 cc: JPMDL (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2019)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-11295. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order of MDL Transfer to District of California, Northern. MDL case number is 2741. Electronic file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter)(sa)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Conditional Transfer Order from MDL Panel regarding MDL 2741. (sa)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (clc)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (gk)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Monsanto Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7717563) filed by Maxine Walker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Richard Lee Root added to party Maxine Walker(pty:pla).(Root, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?