Daigle v. Monsanto Company

Case Number: 3:2019cv04011
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Middle District of Louisiana (Baton Rouge), 3:19-cv-00410 SDD EWD, Daigle v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 3:19-cv-04011 VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 140 cc: JPMDL (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2019)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Middle; Case Number 3:19-cv-00410. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Transferring Case to JPML Court. (Attachments: #1 Email from JPML)(SWE)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Conditional Transfer Order from the JPML Panel (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (KAH)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (LT)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Submitted (Root, Richard)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 Letter to JPML Panel notifying panel of possible JPML case (EDC)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1960480.), filed by Nicole Daigle. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Summons)(Root, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daigle v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?