Reed v. Monsanto Co

Case Number: 3:2019cv04012
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Western District of Louisiana (Alexandria), 1:19-cv-00632 DDD JPM, Reed v. Monsanto Co, Opened in California Northern District as 3:19-cv-04012 VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 140 cc: JPMDL (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2019)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Western; Case Number 1:19-cv-00632. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR MULTI-DISTRICT LITIGATION TRANSFER CTO # 140, directing transfer to Northern District of California, In Re: Roundup Products Liability Litigation, MDL # 2741. Record electronically transmitted to receiving court. Case Terminated. All future pleadings should be filed with the newly assigned court. (crt,Whidden, C)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE received via email from Clerk of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transmitting Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-140) in MDL No.2741, IN RE: Roundup Products Liability Litigation advising case shall be transferred to the Northern District of California upon request of the record. (crt,Whidden, C)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 5/21/2019. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No 1 for cases assigned to Judge Dee D Drell sent to counsel of record. (Plan of Work - Compliance Deadline set for 7/15/2019.)(crt,Roaix, G)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Monsanto Co (crt,Williams, L)
May 16, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Williams, L)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3950731) filed by Kayla Reed. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Proposed summons/writ)(Attorney Lauren E Godshall added to party Kayla Reed(pty:pla))(aty,Godshall, Lauren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reed v. Monsanto Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?