Etheridge v. Golden Gate National Parks Conservancy et al
Plaintiff: Gretta Etheridge
Defendant: Golden Gate National Parks Conservancy and National Park Service
Case Number: 3:2019cv04023
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Filing 9 Golden Gate National Park Conservancy ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byGolden Gate National Parks Conservancy. (Wild, Kara) (Filed on 7/25/2019)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Gretta Etheridge.. (White, Jamil) (Filed on 7/17/2019)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Golden Gate National Parks Conservancy.. (Wild, Kara) (Filed on 7/17/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/3/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/10/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Golden Gate National Parks Conservancy (Wild, Kara) (Filed on 7/12/2019)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Golden Gate National Parks Conservancy (Wild, Kara) (Filed on 7/12/2019)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/26/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2019)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Golden Gate National Parks Conservancy . (Wild, Kara) (Filed on 7/12/2019)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION UNDER 28 USC 1441 BY DEFENDANT GOLDEN GATE NATIONAL PARK CONSERVANCY from San Francisco County Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-19-573443. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13514857). Filed byGolden Gate National Parks Conservancy. (Wild, Kara) (Filed on 7/12/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Etheridge v. Golden Gate National Parks Conservancy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gretta Etheridge
Represented By: Andrey R. Yurtsan
Represented By: Jamil Louis White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Gate National Parks Conservancy
Represented By: Kara Lianne Wild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Park Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?