Banks v. American Airlines Inc.
Plaintiff: Michele Banks
Defendant: American Airlines Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv04026
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Referring Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #19 Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Replies due by 9/11/2019. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #31 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply To Plaintiff's Opp to Dimiss to September 11, 2019. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
September 5, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #31 Stipulation filed by American Airlines Inc. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
September 4, 2019 Filing 31 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply To Plaintiff's Opp to Dimiss to September 11, 2019 filed by American Airlines Inc. (Araneda, Juan) (Filed on 9/4/2019) Modified on 9/5/2019 (ahm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/5/2019 (ahm, COURT STAFF).
September 4, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply To Plaintiff's Opp to Dimiss to September 11, 2019 filed by American Airlines Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Araneda, Juan) (Filed on 9/4/2019)
September 4, 2019 Filing 29 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Michele Banks.. (Chatila, Beilal) (Filed on 9/4/2019)
September 4, 2019 #REMINDER TO COUNSEL Re: #27 Opposition/Response to Motion, #28 Declaration in Opposition filed by Michele Bank. Please ensure that the case number is correctly reflected on al l future documents as 19-cv-04026 JSC pursuant to #21 Related Case Order. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2019)
September 3, 2019 Filing 28 DECLARATION of MichBanks in Opposition to #19 Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Michele Banks. (Related document(s) #19 ) (Chatila, Beilal) (Filed on 9/3/2019)
September 3, 2019 Filing 27 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #19 Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction) filed by Michele Banks. (Chatila, Beilal) (Filed on 9/3/2019)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #20 Motion to Continue Initial Disclosures and Disclosures Under General Order 71 Pending Ruling on Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2019)
August 22, 2019 Filing 25 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by American Airlines Inc... (Araneda, Juan) (Filed on 8/22/2019)
August 22, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #19 Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction CORRECTION OF DOCKET #15 . Motion Hearing reset for 10/10/2019 at 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2019)
August 22, 2019 Filing 24 AMENDED CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING MOTION HEARING. Please take notice the hearing on Defendant's #19 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction is rescheduled to 10/10/2019 at 9:00 a.m. in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. The briefing schedule shall remain the same. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2019)
August 22, 2019 Filing 23 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff and Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 9/5/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2019)
August 22, 2019 Filing 22 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING MOTION HEARING. Please take notice the hearing on Defendant's #19 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction is rescheduled to 10/2/2019 at 9:00 a.m. in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. The briefing schedule shall remain the same. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2019)
August 22, 2019 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers no longer assigned to the case. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2019)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER RELATING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 8/21/2019. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 16, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Continue Initial Disclosures and Disclosures Under General Order 71 Pending Ruling on Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint [CORRECTION OF DOCKENT # 18] filed by American Airlines Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Juan C. Araneda [CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 18-1], #2 Exhibit 1 TO DECLARATION OF JUAN C. ARANEDA [CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 18-2], #3 Exhibit 2 TO DECLARATION OF JUAN C. ARANEDA [CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 18-3], #4 Proposed Order [CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 18-4])(Araneda, Juan) (Filed on 8/16/2019) Modified on 8/18/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 14, 2019 Filing 19 Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction CORRECTION OF DOCKET #15 filed by American Airlines Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/1/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 8/28/2019. Replies due by 9/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Ray Declaration, #3 Exhibit C - Mitchell Declaration, #4 Exhibit D - Casey Declaration, #5 Exhibit E - Hart Declaration, #6 Exhibit F - Kerchner Declaration, #7 Exhibit G - Chavis-Hale Declaration)(Araneda, Juan) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
August 14, 2019 Filing 18 ***RE-FILED AT DKT. NO. 20 USING CORRECT EVENT** MOTION AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC.S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CHANGE TIME FOR INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND DISCLOSURES UNDER GENERAL ORDER 71 PENDING RULING ON AMERICAN AIRLINES MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by American Airlines Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/1/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 8/28/2019. Replies due by 9/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Juan C. Araneda, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Proposed Order)(Araneda, Juan) (Filed on 8/14/2019) Modified on 8/21/2019 (fs, COURT STAFF).
August 14, 2019 Filing 17 Proposed Order re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by American Airlines Inc.. (Araneda, Juan) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
August 14, 2019 Filing 16 Request for Judicial Notice re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed byAmerican Airlines Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #15 ) (Araneda, Juan) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
August 14, 2019 Filing 15 ***DISREGARD. SEE DOCKET #19 FOR CORRECT FILING.*** MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by American Airlines Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/1/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 8/28/2019. Replies due by 9/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Ray Declaration, #3 Exhibit C - Mitchell Declaration, #4 Exhibit D - Casey Declaration, #5 Exhibit E - Hart Declaration, #6 Exhibit F - Kerchner Declaration, #7 Exhibit G - Chavis-Hale Declaration)(Araneda, Juan) (Filed on 8/14/2019) Modified on 8/15/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF REFERRAL TO DETERMINE WHETHER CASES ARE RELATED. The above captioned case is not the "lowest numbered case" as required by Civil Local Rule 3-12(b). This case is referred sua sponte to the Hon. Jacqueline Scott Corley to consider whether it is related to case 19-cv-00324-JSC; re #9 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Relate Cases filed by American Airlines Inc. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/13/2019. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2019)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying as moot #10 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. The hearing set for September 10, 2019 is VACATED. (ygrlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2019)
July 31, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT (with jury demand) against American Airlines Inc. Filed by Michele Banks. (Chatila, Beilal) (Filed on 7/31/2019) Modified on 8/1/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
July 19, 2019 Filing 11 Request for Judicial Notice re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed byAmerican Airlines Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #10 ) (Araneda, Juan) (Filed on 7/19/2019)
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by American Airlines Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/10/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 8/2/2019. Replies due by 8/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - SFSC Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Ray Declaration, #3 Exhibit C - Mitchell Declaration, #4 Exhibit D - Casey Declaration, #5 Exhibit E - Hart Declaration, #6 Exhibit F - Kerchner Declaration, #7 Exhibit G - Chavis-Hale Declaration, #8 Proposed Order, #9 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Araneda, Juan) (Filed on 7/19/2019)
July 18, 2019 Filing 9 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Relate Cases filed by American Airlines Inc.. Responses due by 7/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Araneda, Juan) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Daniel E. Farrington. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2019)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Airlines Inc. OF ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT AND ADR DEADLINES; NOTICE OF ELIGIBILITY FOR VIDEO RECORDING AND GENERAL ORDER 71 (Araneda, Juan) (Filed on 7/16/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review G eneral Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 10/14/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/21/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Airlines Inc. of Standing Orders (Araneda, Juan) (Filed on 7/12/2019)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Daniel E. Farrington ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13515988.) filed by American Airlines Inc.. (Araneda, Juan) (Filed on 7/12/2019)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by American Airlines Inc. identifying Corporate Parent American Airlines Group Inc., Corporate Parent American Airlines Inc., Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc., Other Affiliate PRIMECAP Management Company, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway Inc. for American Airlines Inc.. (Araneda, Juan) (Filed on 7/12/2019)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2019)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from San Francisco Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-19-576123. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13515545). Filed by American Airlines Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Araneda, Juan) (Filed on 7/12/2019) Modified on 7/15/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Banks v. American Airlines Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Airlines Inc.
Represented By: Juan Carlos Araneda
Represented By: Daniel E Farrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele Banks
Represented By: Beilal Mohamad-Ali Chatila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?