Dytch v. Xolo Taqueria LLC et al
Plaintiff: Albert Dytch
Defendant: Xolo Taqueria LLC, Weinstein Family General Partnership II, WFGP LLC and The 1027 A Street LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv04037
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Hixson
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Albert Dytch. Service waived by Weinstein Family General Partnership II waiver sent on 8/9/2019, answer due 10/8/2019. (Best, Zachary) (Filed on 8/9/2019)
August 8, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION for First Extension of Time for Defendants XOLO Taqueria LLC, WFGP, LLC; The 1027 A Street LLC; and Weinstein Family General Partnership II, dba MacArthur Ltd., Limited Company to Respond to Complaint filed by The 1027 A Street LLC, WFGP LLC, Weinstein Family General Partnership II, Xolo Taqueria LLC. (Bovarnick, Steven) (Filed on 8/8/2019)
July 30, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Albert Dytch. WFGP LLC served on 7/18/2019, answer due 8/8/2019. (Best, Zachary) (Filed on 7/30/2019)
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Albert Dytch. The 1027 A Street LLC served on 7/18/2019, answer due 8/8/2019. (Best, Zachary) (Filed on 7/30/2019)
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Albert Dytch. Xolo Taqueria LLC served on 7/18/2019, answer due 8/8/2019. (Best, Zachary) (Filed on 7/30/2019)
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Albert Dytch.. (Best, Zachary) (Filed on 7/30/2019)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to The 1027 A Street LLC, WFGP LLC, Weinstein Family General Partnership II, Xolo Taqueria LLC. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2019)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet by Albert Dytch . (Best, Zachary) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 15, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Latest Version of Civil Cover Sheet not used. Please see the court's website for the latest version. Submit your document using Civil Events > Oth er Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Albert Dytch (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/29/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Best, Zachary) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Asserting Denial of Right of Access Under The Americans With Disabilities Act (ADA) against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13518774.). Filed byAlbert Dytch. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Best, Zachary) (Filed on 7/15/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dytch v. Xolo Taqueria LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xolo Taqueria LLC
Represented By: Steven H. Bovarnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weinstein Family General Partnership II
Represented By: Steven H. Bovarnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WFGP LLC
Represented By: Steven H. Bovarnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The 1027 A Street LLC
Represented By: Steven H. Bovarnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Dytch
Represented By: Zachary Manning Best
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?