Lopez v. Forest River, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Elida Lopez
Defendant: Forest River, Inc. and See-Grins, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv04067
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Referring Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Eileen Theresa Booth (Booth, Eileen) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Robert Edmund Davies (Davies, Robert) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
August 28, 2019 Filing 19 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Forest River, Inc., Elida Lopez and See-Grins, Inc. (Davies, Robert) (Filed on 8/28/2019) Modified on 8/29/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
August 21, 2019 Filing 18 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Forest River, Inc. and Elida Lopez. (Davies, Robert) (Filed on 8/21/2019) Modified on 8/21/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
August 8, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT filed by See-Grins, Inc. and Elida Lopez. (Jacobsen, Karen) (Filed on 8/8/2019) Modified on 8/9/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
August 8, 2019 Filing 16 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Forest River, Inc. and Elida Lopez. (Davies, Robert) (Filed on 8/8/2019) Modified on 8/8/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
August 1, 2019 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING CMC ON REASSIGNMENT: Case Management Statement due by 10/17/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/24/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. Standing orders can be downloaded from the Court's webpage at www.cand.uscourts.gov/whaorders. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2019)
August 1, 2019 Filing 14 Case REASSIGNED to Judge William Alsup. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi no longer assigned to case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2019)
August 1, 2019 Filing 13 This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #http://cand.uscourts.gov/news/225. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2019)
July 31, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2019)
July 31, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Elida Lopez.. (Baker, Terry) (Filed on 7/31/2019)
July 31, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 8/14/2019. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2019)
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elida Lopez. Elida Lopez served on 7/18/2019, answer due 8/8/2019. (Baker, Terry) (Filed on 7/30/2019)
July 29, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] Please re-file in its entirety using correct event Summons Returned Executed. Re: #8 Certificate of Service filed by Elida Lopez (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 ***INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED WHEN POSTING DOCUMENT*** CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Elida Lopez re #6 Summons Issued, #7 Summons Issued (Baker, Terry) (Filed on 7/29/2019) Modified text on 7/30/2019 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to See-Grins, Inc.. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2019)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Forest River, Inc.. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2019)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/8/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/15/2019 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2019)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/30/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2019)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Baker, Terry) (Filed on 7/16/2019)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Baker, Terry) (Filed on 7/16/2019)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13522159.). Filed byElida Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Baker, Terry) (Filed on 7/16/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. Forest River, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forest River, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Edmund Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: See-Grins, Inc.
Represented By: Karen L. Jacobsen
Represented By: Eileen Theresa Booth
Represented By: Robert Edmund Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elida Lopez
Represented By: Terry L. Baker
Represented By: Jon Philip Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?