National Public Radio, Inc. et al v. Federal Bureau of Investigation et al

Plaintiff: Eric Westervelt and National Public Radio, Inc.
Defendant: National Archives & Records Administration, Federal Bureau of Investigation and U.S. Department of Justice
Case Number: 3:2019cv04126
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 16 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, National Archives & Records Administration, U.S. Department of Justice. (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 14, 2019 Filing 15 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Federal Bureau of Investigation, National Archives & Records Administration, U.S. Department of Justice.. (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
August 1, 2019 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by National Public Radio, Inc., Eric Westervelt.. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 8/1/2019)
August 1, 2019 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 8/15/2019. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2019)
August 1, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint, Etc. served on National Archives & Records Administration - College Park, MD on 07/29/2019, filed by National Public Radio, Inc., Eric Westervelt. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 8/1/2019)
August 1, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint, Etc. served on National Archives & Records Administration - Washington D.C. on 07/23/2019, filed by National Public Radio, Inc., Eric Westervelt. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 8/1/2019)
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint, Etc. served on Federal Bureau of Investigation - San Francisco, CA on 07/19/2019, filed by National Public Radio, Inc., Eric Westervelt. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 8/1/2019)
August 1, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint, Etc. served on Federal Bureau of Investigation - Washington D.C. on 07/19/2019, filed by National Public Radio, Inc., Eric Westervelt. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 8/1/2019)
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint, Etc. served on U.S. Department of Justice - San Francisco, CA on 07/19/2019, filed by National Public Radio, Inc., Eric Westervelt. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 8/1/2019)
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint, Etc. served on U.S. Department of Justice - Washington D.C. on 07/19/2019, filed by National Public Radio, Inc., Eric Westervelt. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 8/1/2019)
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Emmet P. Ong (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 8/1/2019)
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Federal Bureau of Investigation, National Archives & Records Administration, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
July 18, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/10/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/17/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
July 18, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/1/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 7/17/2019)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief for Violation of the Freedom of Information Act, 5 U.S.C. section 552 et seq. against All Defendants. Filed byNational Public Radio, Inc., Eric Westervelt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 7/17/2019) Filing Fee paid with receipt number 0971-13529032. Modified on 7/18/2019 (srnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Public Radio, Inc. et al v. Federal Bureau of Investigation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Westervelt
Represented By: Thomas R. Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Public Radio, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas R. Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Archives & Records Administration
Represented By: Emmet P. Ong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation
Represented By: Emmet P. Ong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Justice
Represented By: Emmet P. Ong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?