Cates v. Saul
Plaintiff: LAWRENCE JAMES CATES
Defendant: Comm'r of SSA Andrew M. Saul and Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 3:2019cv04183
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by LAWRENCE JAMES CATES.. (Weems, Robert) (Filed on 8/6/2019)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 8/20/2019. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2019)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED DOCUMENT by LAWRENCE JAMES CATES. civil cover sheet. (Weems, Robert) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER: (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 22, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Please File Amended Civil Cover Sheet listing correct Defendant Name of "Andrew M. Saul" and re-file as a separate docket entry. Filed Civil Co ver Sheet lists David L. Anderson, United States Attorney as defendant re #1 .1] Complaint filed by LAWRENCE JAMES CATES (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/2/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2019)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13537964.). Filed byLAWRENCE JAMES CATES. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Weems, Robert) (Filed on 7/19/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cates v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAWRENCE JAMES CATES
Represented By: Robert Chipley Weems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comm'r of SSA Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?