Phillips v. General Motors Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Lavonda Phillips
Defendant: Takata Corporation and General Motors Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv04201
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Lavonda Phillips.. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2019)
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Defendant Takata Corporation. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 Acknowledgment of Receipt by United States Marshals Service of re #6 Summons. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
July 25, 2019 service packet delivered to the United States Marshals Service Post Box in the Clerk's Office mailroom. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2019)
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Defendants General Motors Corporation & Takata Corporation. (Attachments: #(1) USM Form 285) (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2019)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/14/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/21/2019 at 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order For All Judges)(cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Lavonda Phillips. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT: Jury Demand against General Motors Corporation, Takata Corporation. Filed byLavonda Phillips. Consent/Declination due by 8/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. General Motors Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takata Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lavonda Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?