Jolivette v. People of the State of California
Plaintiff: Paul Patrick Jolivette
Defendant: People of the State of California
Case Number: 3:2019cv04213
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: PSLC CET
Referring Judge: Edward M Chen
2 Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:1651
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Paul Patrick Jolivette. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2019)
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Paul Patrick Jolivette. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2019)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case. Signed by the Clerk on 07/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2019)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: The Clerk shall reassign this case to a district judge pursuant to the Courts assignment plan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/29/19. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2019) Modified on 7/24/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 8/30/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Paul Patrick Jolivette. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 JUDICIAL NOTICE of Lodgment (Fed.R.Evid.902) by Paul Patrick Jolivette (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Mandate (28 USC 1651) Memornadum of Points and Authorities: Affidavit and Exhibits filed by Paul Patrick Jolivette. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jolivette v. People of the State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Patrick Jolivette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: People of the State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?