Holmes v. Dovenmuehle Mortgage, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Holmes Dorothy
Defendant: Netco, Inc., an Illinois corporation, Mortgage Electronic Systems, Inc., a Delaware corporation, Dovenmuehle Mortgage, Inc., a Delaware corporation, Village Capital & Investment LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Village Capital & Investment LLC, Dovenmuehle Mortgage, Inc. and Netco, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv04253
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice by Holmes Dorothy (Cara, Anthony) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of First Cause of Action ONLY by Holmes Dorothy (Cara, Anthony) (Filed on 8/7/2019)
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants Dovenmuehle Mortgage, Village Capital & Mortgage Electronic Registration shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 8/13/2019. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2019)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING re #7 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Village Capital & Investment LLC, Dovenmuehle Mortgage, Inc.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/30/19. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2019)
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint filed by Dovenmuehle Mortgage, Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Village Capital & Investment LLC. (Howson, Christine) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dovenmuehle Mortgage, Inc., Village Capital & Investment LLC (Howson, Christine) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dovenmuehle Mortgage, Inc., Village Capital & Investment LLC (Howson, Christine) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/18/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/25/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2019)
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/7/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Dovenmuehle Mortgage, Inc., a Delaware corporation, Village Capital & Investment LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company identifying Other Affiliate Allen Knudson, Other Affiliate KB Holding Trust for Village Capital & Investment LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company. (Howson, Christine) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Pursuant to 28 USC 1331 and 1441(a) [Federal Question], and 28 USC 1332 & 1441(b) [Diversity of Citizenship] from Contra Costa County Superior Court. Their case number is C19-01199. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0971-13549138). Filed by Village Capital & Investment LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company, Dovenmuehle Mortgage, Inc., a Delaware corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Howson, Christine) (Filed on 7/24/2019) Modified on 7/25/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holmes v. Dovenmuehle Mortgage, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Netco, Inc., an Illinois corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Systems, Inc., a Delaware corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dovenmuehle Mortgage, Inc., a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Christine Elizabeth Howson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Village Capital & Investment LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company
Represented By: Christine Elizabeth Howson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Christine Elizabeth Howson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Village Capital & Investment LLC
Represented By: Christine Elizabeth Howson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dovenmuehle Mortgage, Inc.
Represented By: Christine Elizabeth Howson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Netco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holmes Dorothy
Represented By: Peter L. Nisson
Represented By: Anthony Paul Cara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?