Yurok Tribe et al v. U.S. Bureau of Reclamation et al
Plaintiff: Institute for Fisheries Resources, Yurok Tribe and Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations
Defendant: National Marine Fisheries Service and U.S. Bureau of Reclamation
Case Number: 3:2019cv04405
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/5/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 10/29/2019. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/17/2019. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2019)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Ashley Bennett. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2019)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Patti A. Goldman. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2019)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RELATING CASE. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/12/2019. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 8/9/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2019)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2019)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Institute for Fisheries Resources, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, Yurok Tribe.. (Boyles, Kristen) (Filed on 8/8/2019)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Ashley Bennett ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13590874.) filed by Institute for Fisheries Resources, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, Yurok Tribe. (Bennett, Ashley) (Filed on 8/7/2019)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Patti Goldman ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13590725.) filed by Institute for Fisheries Resources, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, Yurok Tribe. (Goldman, Patti) (Filed on 8/7/2019)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Actions by Institute for Fisheries Resources, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, Yurok Tribe (Boyles, Kristen) (Filed on 8/2/2019) Modified on 8/8/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Issued as to National Marine Fisheries Service, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2019)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/25/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/1/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2019)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/15/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2019)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Institute for Fisheries Resources, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, Yurok Tribe (Boyles, Kristen) (Filed on 7/31/2019)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Boyles, Kristen) (Filed on 7/31/2019)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against National Marine Fisheries Service, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-13570186.). Filed by Yurok Tribe, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Boyles, Kristen) (Filed on 7/31/2019) Modified on 8/2/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yurok Tribe et al v. U.S. Bureau of Reclamation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Institute for Fisheries Resources
Represented By: Kristen Lee Boyles
Represented By: Ashley N. Bennett
Represented By: Patti A. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yurok Tribe
Represented By: Kristen Lee Boyles
Represented By: Ashley N. Bennett
Represented By: Daniel James Cordalis
Represented By: Patti A. Goldman
Represented By: Amy Cordalis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations
Represented By: Kristen Lee Boyles
Represented By: Ashley N. Bennett
Represented By: Patti A. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Marine Fisheries Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bureau of Reclamation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?