Aballo et al v. Capital One Financial Corporation et al
Plaintiff: AIMEE ABALLO and SETH ZIELICKE
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA) N.A., Capital One, N.A., GitHub, Inc. and Capital One Financial Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv04475
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER RE #16 MOTION TO STAY OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT by Judge William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2019)
August 23, 2019 Filing 27 STIPULATION re #3 Complaint Plaintiffs' and Defendants Capital One's Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint filed by Capital One Bank (USA) N.A., Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One, N.A., Seth Zielicke and Aimee Aballo. (Morris, George) (Filed on 8/23/2019) Modified on 8/26/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #22 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Sarah C. Kohlhofer. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2019)
August 23, 2019 Filing 25 Joinder re #16 MOTION to Stay re #3 Complaint : Capital One Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Stay or, In the Alternative, For An Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint Joinder in Support of Capital One Defendants' Motion to Stay by GitHub, Inc.. (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 8/23/2019)
August 22, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Jessica Pomeroy Notice of Appearance of Lauren J. Pomeroy as Counsel for GitHub, Inc. (Pomeroy, Lauren) (Filed on 8/22/2019)
August 22, 2019 Filing 23 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint filed by GitHub, Inc., Seth Zielicke and Aimee Aballo. (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 8/22/2019) Modified on 8/23/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
August 22, 2019 Filing 22 Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13586460.) Filing fee previously paid on 8/6/2019 filed by Aimee Aballo, Seth Zielicke. (Kohlhofer, Sarah) (Filed on 8/22/2019)
August 20, 2019 Filing 21 Certificate of Interested Entities by Capital One Bank (USA) N.A., Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Capital One Financial Corp. for Capital One Bank (USA) N.A., Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One, N.A.. Defendants Capital One - FRCP 7-1; Civil Local Rule 3-15 (Morris, George) (Filed on 8/20/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 20 Certificate of Interested Entities by GitHub, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Microsoft Corp. for GitHub, Inc.. Defendant GITHUB, INC.'s Corporate Disclosure Statement Under FRCP 7.1 and Certification of Interested Parties Under Civil L.R. 3-15 (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Christopher Wong as Counsel for Defendant GITHUB, INC. (Wong, Kyle) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Whitty Somvichian as Counsel for Defendant GITHUB, INC. (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Graham Rhodes as Counsel for Defendant GITHUB, INC. (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Stay re #3 Complaint : Capital One Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Stay or, In the Alternative, For An Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint filed by Capital One Bank (USA) N.A., Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One, N.A.. Motion Hearing set for 9/26/2019 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 9/3/2019. Replies due by 9/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Proposed Order)(Morris, George) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by George Ruben Morris (Morris, George) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 13, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aimee Aballo, Seth Zielicke re #5 Summons Issued (Soneji, Sabita) (Filed on 8/13/2019)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge William Alsup denying #7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Sarah C. Kohlhofer. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
August 12, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING CMC ON REASSIGNMENT: Case Management Statement due by 10/24/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/31/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. Standing orders can be downloaded from the Court's webpage at www.cand.uscourts.gov/whaorders. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 08/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
August 9, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2019)
August 9, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Aimee Aballo, Seth Zielicke.. (Soneji, Sabita) (Filed on 8/9/2019)
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aimee Aballo, Seth Zielicke re #5 Summons Issued (Soneji, Sabita) (Filed on 8/8/2019) Modified on 8/9/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13586460.) filed by AIMEE ABALLO, SETH ZIELICKE. (Kohlhofer, Sarah) (Filed on 8/6/2019)
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/29/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/5/2019 01:30 PM. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2019)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Capital One Financial Corporation, GitHub, Inc. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2019)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/16/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2019)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with jury demand CORRECTION OF DOCKET #1 against All Defendants. Filed by AIMEE ABALLO, SETH ZIELICKE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Zavareei, Hassan) (Filed on 8/1/2019) Modified on 8/2/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Zavareei, Hassan) (Filed on 8/1/2019)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 ***DISREGARD. INCORRECT PDF ATTACHED PER FILER. SEE DOCKET #3***COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13574773.). Filed byAIMEE ABALLO, SETH ZIELICKE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Zavareei, Hassan) (Filed on 8/1/2019) Modified on 8/2/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aballo et al v. Capital One Financial Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA) N.A.
Represented By: George Ruben Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One, N.A.
Represented By: George Ruben Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GitHub, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle Christopher Wong
Represented By: Michael Graham Rhodes
Represented By: Lauren Jessica Pomeroy
Represented By: Whitty Somvichian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Financial Corporation
Represented By: George Ruben Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AIMEE ABALLO
Represented By: Hassan Ali Zavareei
Represented By: Sarah C Kohlhofer
Represented By: Sabita J. Soneji
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SETH ZIELICKE
Represented By: Hassan Ali Zavareei
Represented By: Sarah C Kohlhofer
Represented By: Sabita J. Soneji
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?