Stay Frosty Enterprises LLC v. Teespring, Inc.
Plaintiff: Stay Frosty Enterprises LLC
Defendant: Empire Design and Insignia, Teespring, Inc., Coastal Advertising Specialties Inc., US DOD Coins LLC, Teezilly LLC, Veteran Apparel LLC, Sunfrog LLC, Spreadshirt Inc., Viralstyle LLC, Milcoins.com LLC, Ismael Ramos, Kidder Corp, Amazon.com Inc and Empire Design and Insignia a New York Limited Liability Company doing business as Empire Coin Co.
Case Number: 3:2019cv04607
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim for Settlement (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2020)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 135 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Amended Pleadings due by 4/13/2020. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/13/2020. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2020)
February 13, 2020 Filing 134 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard Seeborg: Initial Case Management Conference held telephonically on 2/13/2020.Court to issue a Case Management Scheduling Order.Total Time in Court: 15 minutes. Not Reported or Recorded.Plaintiff Attorney: James Mills - Telephonic. Defendant Attorney: Jamie Otto - Telephonic. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/13/2020)
February 7, 2020 Filing 133 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Stay Frosty Enterprises LLC. (Mills, James) (Filed on 2/7/2020)
February 6, 2020 Filing 132 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Teespring, Inc.. (Otto, Jamie) (Filed on 2/6/2020)
January 29, 2020 Filing 131 TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE: The Initial Case Management Conference set for February 13, 2020 will be held at 11:00 AM. All parties shall appear telephonically and must contact Court Call at (866) 582-6878 at least one week prior to the Conference to arrange their participation. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2020)
December 18, 2019 Filing 130 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Initial Case Management Conference previously set for February 6, 2020 is continued to February 13, 2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by February 6, 2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2019)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER RELATING CASES 19-cv-03162 RS, 19-cv-04607 RS, 19-cv-06851 RS, 19-cv-01494 RS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/4/19. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2019)
November 8, 2019 Filing 128 CLERK'S NOTICE RE REASSIGNED CASE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an in-person Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/6/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg upon reassignment. Case Management Statement due by 1/30/2020.For a copy of Judge Seeborg's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. If either party so desires, however, counsel may file a request to appear by telephone at 11:00 am, in which case the Conference will be moved to 11:00 am to be held telephonically for all parties, and all parties must contact Court Conference at 866/582-6878 at least one week prior to the Conference. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2019)
November 8, 2019 Filing 127 Case Reassigned to Judge Richard Seeborg. Judge Susan Illston no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2019)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER RELATING CASES 19-01494 RS and 19-04607 SI. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/8/19. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2019)
November 7, 2019 Filing 125 Judge Illston's Standing Order. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2019)
November 6, 2019 Filing 124 CLERK'S NOTICE Case Management Statement due by 11/19/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/26/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2019)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Susan Illston for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 11/05/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2019)
November 4, 2019 Filing 122 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2019)
October 30, 2019 Filing 121 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Mills, James) (Filed on 10/30/2019)
October 30, 2019 Filing 120 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Teespring, Inc... (Otto, Jamie) (Filed on 10/30/2019)
October 30, 2019 Filing 119 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Defendant Teespring, Inc. (Otto, Jamie) (Filed on 10/30/2019)
October 30, 2019 Filing 118 NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie Y. Otto on behalf of Defendant Teespring, Inc. (Otto, Jamie) (Filed on 10/30/2019)
October 25, 2019 Filing 117 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Counsel shall comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
August 27, 2019 Filing 116 NOTICE of Change In Counsel re Withdrawal of Todd G. Glass by Anthony J Weibell. (Weibell, Anthony) (Filed on 8/27/2019) Modified on 8/28/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
August 12, 2019 Filing 115 CLERK'S NOTICE Acknowledging Receipt of Case Transfer in from the USDC Oregon, Case No. 3:18-cv-283-SB. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
August 8, 2019 Filing 114 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/30/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/6/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2019) Modified on 8/12/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
August 8, 2019 Filing 113 Case transferred in from District of Oregon; Case Number 3:18-cv-00283. Case file and copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified on 8/12/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
August 6, 2019 Filing 112 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney James Mills is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Daniel DiCicco Filed by Stay Frosty Enterprises LLC. (Mills, James)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER: The Court ADOPTS Magistrate Judge Beckerman's Findings and Recommendation #109 . Accordingly, the Court GRANTS Defendant Teespring's motions to sever and transfer and DENIES its motion to dismiss #94 . Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Teespring are severed from this action and transferred to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed on 8/5/2019 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (gw)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 110 Order referring Findings and Recommendation (ECF No. #109 ) and Motion to Sever and Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Venue (ECF No. #94 ) to Judge Hernandez. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
June 6, 2019 Filing 109 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION: For the foregoing reasons, the Court recommends that the district judge GRANT Teespring's motions to sever and to transfer and DENY Teespring's motion to dismiss (ECF No. #94 ), sever Stay Frosty's claims against Teespring, and transfer the severed claims to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California. Objections to the Findings and Recommendation are due by 6/20/2019. Signed on 6/6/2019 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
May 28, 2019 Filing 108 Clerk's Entry of Default as to Milcoins.com LLC. (gw)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER: Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default of Party Milcoins.com, LLC (ECF No. #105 ). The Clerk shall enter the default of defendant Milcoins.com, LLC. Ordered on 5/28/2019 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
April 15, 2019 Filing 106 Declaration of Daniel DiCicco . Filed by Stay Frosty Enterprises LLC. (Related document(s): Motion for default #105 .) (DiCicco, Daniel)
April 15, 2019 Filing 105 Motion for Entry of Default of Party Milcoins.com, LLC. Filed by Stay Frosty Enterprises LLC. (DiCicco, Daniel)
April 9, 2019 Filing 104 Notice of Attorney Withdrawal: re Ryan T. O'Hollaren (Todd G. Glass and Anthony J Weibell to remain attorneys of record in his place) Filed by Teespring.com Inc. (Weibell, Anthony)
April 8, 2019 Filing 103 Stipulated Notice of Dismissal of Party SunFrog, LLC Filed by Stay Frosty Enterprises LLC. (DiCicco, Daniel)
March 20, 2019 Filing 102 Reply in Support of Defendant Teespring, Inc.'s (1) Motion to Sever and (2) Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Venue. Filed by Teespring.com Inc. (Related document(s): Motion to Sever, Motion to Dismiss #94 .) (Weibell, Anthony)
March 11, 2019 Filing 101 Response to Motion to Strike SunFrog's Exhibits and Arguments #98 . Filed by Sunfrog LLC. (Di Giacomo, John)
March 7, 2019 Filing 100 Exhibit 8 re Reply #97 . This filing includes a conventionally filed DVD. This conventional filing is maintained in the Clerk's Office but cannot be made a part of the court's electronic record in CM/ECF.. Filed by Sunfrog LLC. (joha)
March 6, 2019 Filing 99 Response to Motion to Sever and Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Venue #94 . Filed by Stay Frosty Enterprises LLC. (DiCicco, Daniel)
March 1, 2019 Filing 98 Motion to Strike SunFrog's Exhibits and Arguments. Filed by Stay Frosty Enterprises LLC. (DiCicco, Daniel)
March 1, 2019 Filing 97 Reply in Support of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings #91 . ORAL ARGUMENT requested. Filed by Sunfrog LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4, #2 Exhibit 5, #3 Exhibit 6, #4 Exhibit 7, #5 Exhibit 8, #6 Exhibit 9, #7 Exhibit 10) (Di Giacomo, John) Modified on 3/1/2019 to correct title and add exhibit numbers (gw).
February 28, 2019 Filing 96 Response to Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings #91 . Filed by Teespring.com Inc. (Weibell, Anthony)
February 28, 2019 Filing 95 Declaration of Anthony J Weibell in Support of Defendant Teespring, Inc.'s Motion to Sever and Motion to Dismiss or Transfer. Filed by Teespring.com Inc. (Related document(s): Motion to Sever #94 .) (Weibell, Anthony)
February 28, 2019 Filing 94 Motion to Sever and Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Venue. Filed by Teespring.com Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Weibell, Anthony).
February 15, 2019 Filing 93 Response to Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings #91 ORAL ARGUMENT requested. Filed by Stay Frosty Enterprises LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Todd Gilbert, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Dan DiCicco, #3 Errata Harley Davidson v. SunFrog) (DiCicco, Daniel)
February 14, 2019 Filing 92 Memorandum in Support . Filed by Sunfrog LLC. (Related document(s): Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings #91 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (Misterovich, Eric)
February 14, 2019 Filing 91 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings . Oral Argument requested. Filed by Sunfrog LLC. (Misterovich, Eric)
February 14, 2019 Filing 90 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Sunfrog LLC. (Misterovich, Eric)
February 14, 2019 Filing 89 Answer to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Sunfrog LLC. (Misterovich, Eric)
February 12, 2019 Filing 88 Stipulated Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Parties Filed by Stay Frosty Enterprises LLC. (DiCicco, Daniel)
February 12, 2019 Filing 87 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Eric W. Misterovich (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: ewmisterovich. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Eric W. Misterovich for Sunfrog LLC. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 82188 issued. Signed on 2/12/2019 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (ecp)
February 12, 2019 Filing 85 Notification of CM/ECF Account for John A. Di Giacomo (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: jadigiacomo. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of John A. Di Giacomo for Sunfrog LLC. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 82188 issued. Signed on 2/12/2019 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (ecp)
February 7, 2019 Filing 83 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Eric W. Misterovich. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Receipt No.: 82188. Filed by Sunfrog LLC. (ecp)
February 7, 2019 Filing 82 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John A. Di Giacomo. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Receipt No.: 82188. Filed by Sunfrog LLC. (ecp)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER. As Defendant Amazon.com, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Sever (ECF No. #66 ) was granted on 1/23/2019 (ECF No. 77) and Plaintiff filed a separate case against Amazon.com, Inc. on 2/4/2019 (3:19-cv-00166), Amazon.com, Inc. is terminated from this action. Ordered on 2/5/2019 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
February 1, 2019 Filing 80 Stipulated Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Parties Filed by Stay Frosty Enterprises LLC. (DiCicco, Daniel)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER: In light of the Joint Dismissal of Oregon Common Law Conversion Claims (ECF No. #78 ), Finding as Moot Motion to Dismiss of Defendant Amazon.com, Inc. (ECF No. #65 ). Ordered on 1/31/2019 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
January 28, 2019 Filing 78 Stipulated Notice dismissing Oregon Conversion claims Filed by Stay Frosty Enterprises LLC. (DiCicco, Daniel)
January 23, 2019 Filing 77 MINUTES of Proceedings: Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman by telephone on 1/23/2019. ORDER granting Amazon.com, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Sever (ECF No. #66 ). Plaintiff to file new Complaint against Amazon.com, Inc., indicating that the new case is related to the instant case. The Court will deny as moot Amazon's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #65 ) after Plaintiff files a stipulated dismissal of its conversion claims. Daniel DiCicco present as counsel for plaintiff. Robert T. Cruzen present as counsel for defendant Amazon.com, Inc. Anthony J. Weibell present as counsel for defendant Teespring.com Inc. David H. Madden present as counsel for defendant Sunfrog LLC. Casey M. Nokes present as counsel for defendant Spreadshirt Inc. Court Reporter: Jill Jessup. Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman presiding. (gw)
January 22, 2019 Filing 76 Notice of Appearance of Leigh F. Gill appearing on behalf of Coastal Advertising Specialties Inc., Kidder Corp Filed by on behalf of Coastal Advertising Specialties Inc., Kidder Corp. (Gill, Leigh)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 SCHEDULING ORDER. Status Conference is set for Wednesday, 1/23/2019, at 10:30 AM in Portland by telephone before Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. The parties shall call into the court's conference line (phone number to be provided via separate e-mail) five minutes before the scheduled conference time. The court will join the conference call at the appointed time. The parties are to use land-line telephones, as the Court prohibits the use of speaker phones, cell phones and headsets. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
January 8, 2019 Filing 74 Response to Motion to Dismiss Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 #65 . Filed by Stay Frosty Enterprises LLC. (DiCicco, Daniel)
January 8, 2019 Filing 73 Unopposed Response to Motion to Sever #66 . Filed by Stay Frosty Enterprises LLC. (DiCicco, Daniel)
January 8, 2019 Filing 72 Response to Order to Show Cause . Filed by Stay Frosty Enterprises LLC. (DiCicco, Daniel)
January 8, 2019 Filing 71 Notice of Appearance of Daniel DiCicco appearing on behalf of Stay Frosty Enterprises LLC Filed by on behalf of Stay Frosty Enterprises LLC. (DiCicco, Daniel)
January 3, 2019 Filing 70 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Stay Frosty Enterprises LLC of Order to Show Cause (ECF No. 69). (gw)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER. On October 16, 2018, Plaintiff's counsel moved to withdraw as counsel of record because Plaintiff terminated the relationship and represented that it was seeking new counsel. The Court granted the motion to withdraw on October 23, 2018. As of January 3, 2019, new counsel has not appeared on behalf of Plaintiff or responded to a motion to dismiss this action. "It is well-settled that corporations and other business entities cannot appear pro se in federal court; they must be represented by licensed counsel." 4580 Thousand Oaks Boulevard Corp. v. Feldman, No. 12-4462, 2013 WL 12123661, at *1 (C.D. Cal. Feb. 20, 2013) (citations omitted). In light of the fact that Plaintiff has been on notice since October 2018, that it must retain new counsel, the Court orders Plaintiff to show cause in writing by January 16, 2019, why this case should not be dismissed. Failure to respond to this order will result in dismissal of this action, without prejudice, for failure to prosecute. Ordered on 1/3/2019 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
December 10, 2018 Filing 68 Notice of Joinder in Motion to Dismiss #65 Filed by Sunfrog LLC. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss #65 .) (Madden, David)
December 7, 2018 Filing 67 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Cruzen, Robert)
December 7, 2018 Filing 66 Motion to Sever . Filed by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Cruzen, Robert)
December 7, 2018 Filing 65 Motion to Dismiss Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Cruzen, Robert)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER: Granting Sunfrog LLC's Fifth Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (ECF No. #63 ). Answer or other responsive pleading is due by 12/10/2018. Ordered on 10/29/2018 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
October 25, 2018 Filing 63 Fifth Motion for Extension of Time to Answer . Filed by Sunfrog LLC. (Madden, David)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER: Granting Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record (ECF No. #61 ), filed by Plaintiff's counsel James E. Bailey, III, Aron D. Yarmo, and Mark S. Hubert. Ordered on 10/23/2018 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
October 16, 2018 Filing 61 Motion to Withdraw or Substitute an Attorney . Filed by Stay Frosty Enterprises LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order granting withdrawal of counsel) (Bailey, James)
October 9, 2018 Filing 60 Certificate of Service by Stay Frosty Enterprises LLC for Defendant US DOD Coins Filed by Stay Frosty Enterprises LLC. (Bailey, James)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER: Granting the Fourth Unopposed Motion to Extend Time for Defendant Amazon.com, Inc. to File an Answer or Other Responsive Pleading (ECF No. #58 ). Amazon's Answer or other responsive pleading is due by 12/10/2018. Ordered on 10/3/2018 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
October 3, 2018 Filing 58 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to Complaint,, #1 . Filed by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Cruzen, Robert)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER: Granting Defendant Sunfrog LLC's Fourth Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (ECF No. #56 ) as follows: Answer or other responsive pleading is due by 10/26/2018. Ordered on 8/27/2018 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
August 24, 2018 Filing 56 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #1 . Filed by Sunfrog LLC. (Madden, David)
August 20, 2018 Filing 55 Certificate of Service by Stay Frosty Enterprises LLC for Defendant ViralStyle Filed by Stay Frosty Enterprises LLC. (Bailey, James)
August 20, 2018 Filing 54 Certificate of Service by Stay Frosty Enterprises LLC for Defendant Veteran Apparel Filed by Stay Frosty Enterprises LLC. (Bailey, James)
August 20, 2018 Filing 53 Certificate of Service by Stay Frosty Enterprises LLC for Defendant Milcoins Filed by Stay Frosty Enterprises LLC. (Bailey, James)
August 20, 2018 Filing 52 Certificate of Service by Stay Frosty Enterprises LLC for Defendant Empire Filed by Stay Frosty Enterprises LLC. (Bailey, James)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER by Judge Beckerman - GRANTING Defendant Amazon's unopposed third motion #50 to extend their time to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint from 8/7/18 to 10/9/18. (peg)
August 1, 2018 Filing 50 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to Complaint,, #1 . Filed by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Cruzen, Robert)
July 17, 2018 Filing 49 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Milcoins.com LLC waiver sent on 2/16/2018. Filed by Stay Frosty Enterprises LLC. (Bailey, James)
July 12, 2018 Filing 48 Amended Summons Issued Electronically as to US DOD Coins LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (joha)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #45 . Answer is due by 8/9/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (jp)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #43 . Answer is due by 8/27/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (jp)
July 9, 2018 Filing 45 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to Complaint,, #1 . Filed by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Cruzen, Robert)
July 6, 2018 Filing 44 Amended Proposed Summons for US DOD Coins LLC Filed by Stay Frosty Enterprises LLC. (Hubert, Mark) The original amended proposed summons attached to this entry at filing was incorrect. A corrected PDF has been uploaded. The Notice of Electronic Filing will be regenerated to all parties.
July 5, 2018 Filing 43 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer . Filed by Sunfrog LLC. (Madden, David)
June 25, 2018 Filing 42 Notice of Dismissal of Party Teezily Filed by Stay Frosty Enterprises LLC. (Bailey, James)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER: Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Order Granting Plaintiff 45 Additional Days to Serve Defendants (ECF No. #40 ). The deadline for Plaintiff to serve defendants is extended to 7/16/2018. Ordered on 6/1/2018 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
June 1, 2018 Filing 40 First Motion To Extend Time to Serve Defendants. Filed by Stay Frosty Enterprises LLC. (Hubert, Mark)
May 17, 2018 Filing 39 Answer to #1 Complaint,, and Affirmative Defenses Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Spreadshirt Inc.. (Nokes, Casey)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER: Granting Sunfrog LLC's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (ECF No. #37 ). Answer or other responsive pleading is due by 7/16/2018. Ordered on 5/15/2018 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
May 14, 2018 Filing 37 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint,, #1 . Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by Sunfrog LLC. (Madden, David)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER: Granting Amazon.com, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (ECF No. #35 ). Amazon.com, Inc.'s Answer or other responsive pleading is due by 7/10/2018. Ordered on 5/7/2018 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
May 4, 2018 Filing 35 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to Complaint. Filed by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Cruzen, Robert)
April 25, 2018 Filing 34 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Teespring.com Inc waiver sent on 2/16/2018. Filed by Stay Frosty Enterprises LLC. (Bailey, James)
April 25, 2018 Filing 33 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Sunfrog LLC waiver sent on 2/16/2018. Filed by Stay Frosty Enterprises LLC. (Bailey, James)
April 25, 2018 Filing 32 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Spreadshirt Inc. waiver sent on 2/16/2018. Filed by Stay Frosty Enterprises LLC. (Bailey, James)
April 25, 2018 Filing 31 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Kidder Corp waiver sent on 2/16/2018. Filed by Stay Frosty Enterprises LLC. (Bailey, James)
April 25, 2018 Filing 30 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Coastal Advertising Specialties Inc. waiver sent on 2/16/2018. Filed by Stay Frosty Enterprises LLC. (Bailey, James)
April 25, 2018 Filing 29 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Amazon.com, Inc. waiver sent on 3/12/2018. Filed by Stay Frosty Enterprises LLC. (Bailey, James)
April 18, 2018 Filing 28 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Ryan T. O'Hollaren (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: rtohollaren. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (jtj)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ryan T. O'Hollaren for Teespring.com Inc. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5381036 issued. Signed on 4/18/2018 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (jtj)
April 18, 2018 Filing 26 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Anthony J. Weibell (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: ajweibell. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (jtj)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Anthony J. Weibell for Teespring.com Inc. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5381008 issued. Signed on 4/18/2018 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (jtj)
April 17, 2018 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FRCP 7.1. Filed by Teespring.com Inc. (Glass, Todd)
April 17, 2018 Filing 23 Answer to #1 Complaint,, Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Teespring.com Inc. (Glass, Todd)
April 17, 2018 Filing 22 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ryan T. O'Hollaren . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5381036. Filed by Teespring.com Inc. (Glass, Todd)
April 17, 2018 Filing 21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Anthony J Weibell . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5381008. Filed by Teespring.com Inc. (Glass, Todd)
April 17, 2018 Filing 20 Notice of Appearance of Todd G. Glass appearing on behalf of Teespring.com Inc Filed by on behalf of Teespring.com Inc. (Glass, Todd)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Granting Defendant Coastal Advertising Specialties, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No. #18 ). Answer or other responsive pleading is due by 5/17/2018. Ordered on 4/17/2018 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
April 16, 2018 Filing 18 Motion for Extension of Time . Filed by Coastal Advertising Specialties Inc.. (Gill, Leigh)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Granting Defendant Spreadshirt Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (ECF No. #15 ). Answer or other responsive pleading is due by 5/17/2018. Ordered on 4/16/2018 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Granting Sunfrog LLC's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (ECF No. #12 ). Answer or other responsive pleading is due by 5/17/2018. Ordered on 4/16/2018 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
April 16, 2018 Filing 15 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to Complaint. Filed by Spreadshirt Inc.. (Nokes, Casey)
April 16, 2018 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance of Casey M. Nokes appearing on behalf of Spreadshirt Inc. Filed by on behalf of Spreadshirt Inc.. (Nokes, Casey)
April 12, 2018 Filing 13 Declaration of David H. MADDEN . Filed by Sunfrog LLC. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition #12 .) (Madden, David)
April 12, 2018 Filing 12 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #1 . Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by Sunfrog LLC. (Madden, David)
April 12, 2018 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance of David H. Madden appearing on behalf of Sunfrog LLC Filed by on behalf of Sunfrog LLC. (Madden, David)
March 12, 2018 Filing 10 Amended Summons Issued Electronically as to Amazon.com, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (joha)
March 12, 2018 Filing 9 Second Amended Proposed Summons to Amazon.com Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Hubert, Mark)
March 1, 2018 Filing 8 Amended Summons Issued Electronically as to Amazon.com, Inc., Milcoins.com LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (joha)
March 1, 2018 Filing 7 Second Amended Proposed Summons for Milcoins.com LLC Filed by Stay Frosty Enterprises LLC. (Hubert, Mark)
March 1, 2018 Filing 6 Amended Proposed Summons Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Hubert, Mark)
February 20, 2018 Filing 5 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office, Library of Congress, Washington, D.C. 20559 regarding Copyright Report #4 . (joha)
February 20, 2018 Filing 4 Copyright Report: This report is being submitted pursuant to 17 U.S.C. section 508(a), which states: Within one month after the filing of any action under this title, the clerks of the courts of the United States shall send written notification to the Register of Copyrights setting forth, as far as is shown by the papers filed in the court, the names and addresses of the parties and the title, author, and registration number of each work involved in the action. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (joha)
February 14, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Amazon.com, Inc., Coastal Advertising Specialties Inc., Empire Design and Insignia, Kidder Corp, Milcoins.com LLC, Ismael Ramos, Spreadshirt Inc., Sunfrog LLC, Teespring.com Inc, Teezilly LLC, US DOD Coins LLC, Veteran Apparel LLC, Viralstyle LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (joha)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 6/14/2018. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 7/16/2018. Pretrial Order is due by 7/16/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (joha)
February 14, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5312420 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Included copyrights: VA-1-997-050--Shogun Pacific Chiefs--Derek Frost, VA 2-070-906--Navy Rate--Derek Frost, VA 2-070-983--Navy Submarine Force Grim Reaper--Derek Frost, VA 2-038-467--Cold War Veteran Coin--Derek Frost, VA 1-997-312--US Navy Snipe--Derek Frost. Filed by Stay Frosty Enterprises LLC against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Proposed Summons). (Hubert, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stay Frosty Enterprises LLC v. Teespring, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Empire Design and Insignia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teespring, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan T. O'Hollaren
Represented By: Anthony J Weibell
Represented By: Todd G. Glass
Represented By: Jamie Y. Otto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coastal Advertising Specialties Inc.
Represented By: Leigh F. Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US DOD Coins LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teezilly LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veteran Apparel LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunfrog LLC
Represented By: David H. Madden
Represented By: John A. Di Giacomo
Represented By: Eric W. Misterovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spreadshirt Inc.
Represented By: Casey M. Nokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viralstyle LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milcoins.com LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ismael Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidder Corp
Represented By: Leigh F. Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Inc
Represented By: Robert T. Cruzen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Empire Design and Insignia a New York Limited Liability Company doing business as Empire Coin Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stay Frosty Enterprises LLC
Represented By: Mark S. Hubert
Represented By: James Edwin Bailey, III
Represented By: Aron D. Yarmo
Represented By: Daniel DiCicco
Represented By: James Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?