Harney v. Saul
Plaintiff: Tyler Harney
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 3:2019cv04684
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Tyler Harney.. (Palmer, James) (Filed on 8/20/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Andrew Saul.. (Kenney, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed in a Social Security Case by Tyler Harney. Tyler Harney served on 8/14/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Palmer, James) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER requiring statement(s) of the administrative record. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on August 14, 2019. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2019)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2019)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/26/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Palmer, James) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Judicial Review of Decision of Commissioner of Social Security against Andrew Saul (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-13602626.). Filed by Tyler Harney. (Attachments: #1 memorandum of points and authorities, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Palmer, James) (Filed on 8/12/2019) Modified on 8/13/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harney v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Harney
Represented By: James Dwight Palmer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?