Peace v. 850 Bryant Street et al
Plaintiff: Michael Peace, Jr.
Defendant: 850 Bryant Street and Hall of Justice
Case Number: 3:2019cv04691
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: PSLC CET
Referring Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
2 Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Susan Illston for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 10/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/7/2019: #2 Certificate/Proof of Service) (bwS, COURT STAFF).
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO REASSIGN CASE TO DISTRICT JUDGE. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 10/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2019)
August 28, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Michael Peace, Jr. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2019)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Michael Peace, Jr. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 850 Bryant Street, Hall of Justice. Filed byMichael Peace, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Sheriff Office Cover Letter, #3 Envelope)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peace v. 850 Bryant Street et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Peace, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 850 Bryant Street
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hall of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?