Velodyne Lidar, Inc. v. Hesai Photonics Technology Co., Ltd.
Plaintiff: Velodyne Lidar, Inc.
Defendant: Hesai Photonics Technology Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2019cv04742
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Hesai Photonics Technology Co., Ltd.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/8/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/15/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia Young (Young, Patricia) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey G. Homrig (Homrig, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/28/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Patent Infringement. (Lumish, Douglas) (Filed on 8/13/2019) Modified on 8/15/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Lumish, Douglas) (Filed on 8/13/2019)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement and L.R. 3-15 Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons by Velodyne Lidar, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Ford Motor Company, Other Affiliate Baidu, Inc. for Velodyne Lidar, Inc.. (Lumish, Douglas) (Filed on 8/13/2019) Modified on 8/15/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement; Demand for Jury Trial against Hesai Photonics Technology Co., Ltd. (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-13606988.). Filed by Velodyne Lidar, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lumish, Douglas) (Filed on 8/13/2019) Modified on 8/15/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Velodyne Lidar, Inc. v. Hesai Photonics Technology Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Velodyne Lidar, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas E. Lumish
Represented By: Jeffrey G. Homrig
Represented By: Patricia Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hesai Photonics Technology Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?