Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California et al v. Webcor Construction, LP
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California and Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California
Defendant: Webcor Construction, LP
Case Number: 3:2019cv04773
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Hixson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Board of Trustees of the Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California. Webcor Construction, LP served on 9/27/2019, answer due 10/18/2019. (Richman, Ronald) (Filed on 10/3/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Webcor Construction, LP. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/7/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/14/2019 10:00 AM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Richman, Ronald) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California.. (Richman, Ronald) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet by Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California . (Richman, Ronald) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
August 14, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Case has been randomly assigned to judge. However, incorrect Civil Cover Sheet used at case opening of JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 02/19). Please complete correct Ci vil Cover Sheet of JS-CAND 44 (Rev 07/19) and re-file in its entirety as a separate docket entry Re: #1 .1] Complaint filed by Board of Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/28/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF COLLECTIVE BARGAINING AGREEMENT AND TO RECOVER UNPAID TRUST FUND CONTRIBUTIONS against Webcor Construction, LP ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13609811.). Filed byBoard of Trustees of the Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Richman, Ronald) (Filed on 8/14/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California et al v. Webcor Construction, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Ronald Lee Richman
Represented By: Sarah Kyong-Ju Lee Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Ronald Lee Richman
Represented By: Sarah Kyong-Ju Lee Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Ronald Lee Richman
Represented By: Sarah Kyong-Ju Lee Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Ronald Lee Richman
Represented By: Sarah Kyong-Ju Lee Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Webcor Construction, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?