Kawahara v. Headway Technologies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Brian A. Kawahara
Defendant: NHK Spring (Thailand) Co., Ltd., NHK Spring Co., Ltd., TDK Corporation, SAE Magnetics (H.K.) Ltd., Magnecomp Precision Technology Public Co. Ltd., Hutchinson Technology Inc., NAT Peripheral (H.K.) Co., Ltd., Headway Technologies, Inc., NHK International Corporation and NAT Peripheral (Dong Guan) Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2019cv04828
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Maxine M Chesney
Referring Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER APPROVING REGARDING EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND ACCEPTING SERVICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 23, 2019. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 20, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and Accepting Service filed by Brian A. Kawahara. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RELATED CASE ORDER. Apex Computers, Inc. v. Headway Technologies, Inc, et al., Case No. 19-5507, is related to Walnum v. Headway Technologies, Inc., et al., Case No. 4738, Kawahara v. Headway Technologies, Inc., et al., Case No. 19-4828, and Glover v. Headway Technologies, Inc., et al., Case No. 19-5268. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 10, 2019. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/15/2019 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/8/2019.. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 9/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order for Judge Maxine M. Chesney, #2 Standing Order for All Judges)(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2019)
September 5, 2019 Filing 11 Case reassigned to Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Judge William Alsup no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RELATED CASE ORDER. Case No. 19-4738 MMC, Walnum v Headway Technologies, Inc., et al., is related to Case No. 19-4828, Kawahara v. Headway Technologies, Inc., et al., and Case No. 19-5268, Glover v. Headway Technologies, Inc., et al. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 4, 2019. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2019)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING CMC ON REASSIGNMENT: Case Management Statement due by 11/7/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/14/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. Standing orders can be downloaded from the Court's webpage at www.cand.uscourts.gov/whaorders. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2019)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 08/26/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2019)
August 26, 2019 ***DISREGARD - SEE DKT. #8 *** ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 08/26/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2019) Modified on 8/26/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2019)
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Brian A. Kawahara.. (Polk, Adam) (Filed on 8/22/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Headway Technologies, Inc., Hutchinson Technology Inc., Magnecomp Precision Technology Public Co. Ltd., NAT Peripheral (Dong Guan) Co., Ltd., NAT Peripheral (H.K.) Co., Ltd., NHK International Corporation, NHK Spring (Thailand) Co., Ltd., NHK Spring Co., Ltd., SAE Magnetics (H.K.) Ltd., TDK Corporation. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/13/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/20/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/29/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (with jury demand) against Headway Technologies, Inc., Hutchinson Technology Inc., Magnecomp Precision Technology Public Co. Ltd., NAT Peripheral (Dong Guan) Co., Ltd., NAT Peripheral (H.K.) Co., Ltd., NHK International Corporation, NHK Spring (Thailand) Co., Ltd., NHK Spring Co., Ltd., SAE Magnetics (H.K.) Ltd., TDK Corporation (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0971-13612188). Filed by Brian A. Kawahara. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 8/14/2019) Modified on 8/15/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kawahara v. Headway Technologies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NHK Spring (Thailand) Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NHK Spring Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TDK Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAE Magnetics (H.K.) Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magnecomp Precision Technology Public Co. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hutchinson Technology Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAT Peripheral (H.K.) Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Headway Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NHK International Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAT Peripheral (Dong Guan) Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian A. Kawahara
Represented By: Jordan S Elias
Represented By: Christina C. Sharp
Represented By: Adam E. Polk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?