DeLarge v. Walmart Inc.
Plaintiff: Demetria DeLarge
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv05019
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 9 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #8 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings ) filed byDemetria DeLarge. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Demetria DeLarge, #2 Request for Judicial Notice)(Allen, Curtis) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Walmart Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/1/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor before Judge Susan Illston. Responses due by 10/8/2019. Replies due by 10/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice ISO Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, #2 Proposed Order)(Mann, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Curtis E. Allen (Allen, Curtis) (Filed on 9/19/2019)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Case Management Statement due by 11/29/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/22/19 has been continued to 12/6/2019 02:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Walmart Inc. Re Supplemental Documents (Mann, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/22/2019)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 11 /15/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/22/2019 02:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording, #2 Standing Order, #3 Standing Order)(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2019)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Susan Illston. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2019)
August 16, 2019 Answer to Removal Complaint found in ( #1 -4) Exhibit B of Notice of Removal by. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2019)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Walmart Inc. (Mann, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/16/2019)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is HG19020004. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13619279). Filed byWalmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Jeffrey Mann, #3 Exhibit A (Complaint), #4 Exhibit B (Answer), #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Mann, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/16/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeLarge v. Walmart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetria DeLarge
Represented By: Curtis E. Allen
Represented By: George S. Khoury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?