Center for Food Safety et al v. Azar et al
Plaintiff: Center for Environmental Health and Center for Food Safety
Defendant: Secretary Alex M. Azar, II, Health and Human Services, Norman E. Sharpless, Alex M. Azar, II and U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Case Number: 3:2019cv05168
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Center for Environmental Health, Center for Food Safety (Attachments: #1 Exhibit of Receipts Verifying Service)(Talbott, Ryan) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
September 3, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Center for Environmental Health, Center for Food Safety.. (Talbott, Ryan) (Filed on 9/3/2019)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Ryan D. Talbott representing Plaintiffs. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Alex M. Azar, II, Norman E. Sharpless, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2019)
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/14/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/21/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2019)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/3/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Ryan D. Talbott ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13625747.) filed by Center for Environmental Health, Center for Food Safety. (Talbott, Ryan) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Center for Environmental Health, Center for Food Safety (Wu, Sylvia) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Center for Environmental Health, Center for Food Safety (Wu, Sylvia) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Wu, Sylvia) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND EQUITABLE RELIEF against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13625449.). Filed byCenter for Food Safety, Center for Environmental Health. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wu, Sylvia) (Filed on 8/19/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center for Food Safety et al v. Azar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Environmental Health
Represented By: Sylvia Shih-Yau Wu
Represented By: Ryan D Talbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Food Safety
Represented By: Sylvia Shih-Yau Wu
Represented By: Ryan D Talbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Alex M. Azar, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norman E. Sharpless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?