Great American Insurance Company et al v. Mediterranean Shipping Company (USA) Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Penver Products Pvt. Ltd. and Great American Insurance Company
Defendant: Mediterranean Shipping Company (USA) Inc. and Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.
Case Number: 3:2019cv05169
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/17/2019. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2019)
October 16, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A... (Marissen, James) (Filed on 10/16/2019)
October 11, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A. (Marissen, James) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 11, 2019 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Entities by Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A. (Marissen, James) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 11, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A. (Marissen, James) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 11, 2019 Filing 9 MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company, S.A.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint byMediterranean Shipping Company S.A. (Marissen, James) (Filed on 10/11/2019) Modified on 10/15/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint (L.R. 6-1(a)) filed by Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.. (Marissen, James) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Mediterranean Shipping Company (USA) Inc., Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2019)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 11/12/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2019 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge William Orrick on 8/20/19. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/20/2019: #1 Notice of Eligibility) (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge William H. Orrick. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2019)
August 19, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Penver Products Pvt. Ltd., Great American Insurance Com pany Cause of Action is 28:1331 Federal Question Not Miscellaneous (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Great American Insurance Company, Penver Products Pvt. Ltd... (Kirsch, Joshua) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Great American Insurance Company, Penver Products Pvt. Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent American Financial Group for Great American Insurance Company. (Kirsch, Joshua) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Kirsch, Joshua) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for damage to ocean cargo against Mediterranean Shipping Company (USA) Inc., Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13625540.). Filed byGreat American Insurance Company, Penver Products Pvt. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kirsch, Joshua) (Filed on 8/19/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Great American Insurance Company et al v. Mediterranean Shipping Company (USA) Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mediterranean Shipping Company (USA) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.
Represented By: Rachel Anne Weitzman
Represented By: James Arthur Henry Marissen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penver Products Pvt. Ltd.
Represented By: Joshua E. Kirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great American Insurance Company
Represented By: Joshua E. Kirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?