Palacios et al v. Ford Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: Herbert Palacios, Richard DeMatteo and Meghan Palacios
Defendant: Ford Motor Company, Avis Rent A Car, Ford Motor Corporation and Avis Rent a Car, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv05237
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Herbert Palacios. Motion Hearing set for 12/6/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 11/22/2019. Replies due by 11/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gibson, Robert) (Filed on 10/21/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 13 CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendant Avis Rent A Car shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 10/16/2019. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
September 30, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Change of Address by Joseph Owen Fitzgerald (Fitzgerald, Joseph) (Filed on 9/30/2019)
September 9, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Avis Rent a Car, LLC.. (Fitzgerald, Joseph) (Filed on 9/9/2019)
September 9, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendant Avis Rent A Car shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 9/23/2019. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2019)
September 6, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ford Motor Corporation.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Burnett, Samantha) (Filed on 9/6/2019)
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 Defendant Avis Rent A Car's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byAvis Rent a Car, LLC. (Fitzgerald, Joseph) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ford Motor Corporation re #6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, (Burnett, Samantha) (Filed on 8/28/2019)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/15/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/22/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2019)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ford Motor Company re Standing Orders (Burnett, Samantha) (Filed on 8/23/2019)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/6/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2019)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ford Motor Company re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, (Burnett, Samantha) (Filed on 8/22/2019)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Ford Motor Company identifying Other Affiliate State Street Corporation, Other Affiliate Evercore Trust Company, N.A., Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Other Affiliate Black Rock, Inc. for Ford Motor Company. (Burnett, Samantha) (Filed on 8/22/2019)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Alameda. Their case number is RG19011465. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13636732). Filed byFord Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint and Pleadings, #3 Exhibit B - Ford Answer in State Court, #4 Exhibit C - Avis Consent to Removal, #5 Exhibit D - DeMatteo's Statement of Damages, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Burnett, Samantha) (Filed on 8/22/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palacios et al v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert Palacios
Represented By: Andrew S. Miller
Represented By: Robert Bentley Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard DeMatteo
Represented By: Andrew S. Miller
Represented By: Robert Bentley Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meghan Palacios
Represented By: Andrew S. Miller
Represented By: Robert Bentley Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Samantha K.N. Burnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avis Rent A Car
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Corporation
Represented By: Samantha K.N. Burnett
Represented By: John Robert Meehan
Represented By: Amir M. Nassihi
Represented By: Matthew Francis Williams,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avis Rent a Car, LLC
Represented By: Joseph Owen Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?