Vermillion v. Juul Labs, Inc.
Plaintiff: NOAH RYAN VERMILLION and Noah Vermillion
Defendant: Juul Labs, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv05286
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 10/16/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2019)
October 15, 2019 DIRECT MEMBER CASE OPENED: Vermillion v. JUUL Labs, Inc., 4:19-cv-05286-DMR pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order cc: JPMDL (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2019)
September 19, 2019 Filing 13 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (with jury demand) against Juul Labs, Inc. Filed by Noah Vermillion. (De La Cerda, Peter) (Filed on 9/19/2019) Modified on 9/20/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Noah Vermillion (De La Cerda, Peter) (Filed on 9/19/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Noah Vermillion To JUUL Labs, Inc. (De La Cerda, Peter) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #9 Stipulation to Stay Proceedings Pending JPML Ruling. Joint status report due by 10/30/2019. Signed on 9/4/2019.(dmrlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2019)
September 3, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER to Stay Proceedings Pending JPML Ruling filed by Juul Labs, Inc., Noah Vermillion. (Schwing, Austin) (Filed on 9/3/2019) Modified on 9/4/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
September 3, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Pendency or Other Action or Proceeding by Juul Labs, Inc. (Schwing, Austin) (Filed on 9/3/2019) Modified on 9/4/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Entities by Juul Labs, Inc. (Schwing, Austin) (Filed on 9/3/2019)
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Juul Labs, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Altria Group, Inc. for Juul Labs, Inc.. (Schwing, Austin) (Filed on 9/3/2019)
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Austin Van Schwing and G. Charles Nierlich, Joshua D. Dick, Peter C. Squeri, Kelsey J. Helland (Schwing, Austin) (Filed on 9/3/2019)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Juul Labs, Inc. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2019)
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/27/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/4/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2019)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/9/2019. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2019)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (with jury demand) against Juul Labs, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0971-13644018). Filed by Noah Vermillion. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(De La Cerda, Peter) (Filed on 8/23/2019) Modified on 8/27/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vermillion v. Juul Labs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juul Labs, Inc.
Represented By: Kelsey John Helland
Represented By: George Charles Nierlich, III
Represented By: Austin Van Schwing
Represented By: Peter C. Squeri
Represented By: Joshua D. Dick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NOAH RYAN VERMILLION
Represented By: Peter De La Cerda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noah Vermillion
Represented By: Peter De La Cerda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?