Joseph v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Audrey Joseph
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 3:2019cv05288
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Transferring case electronically to the District of New Jersey. ***3:19-cv-17678*** (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER (CTO-163) TRANSFERRING CASE to the District of New Jersey re MDL No. 2738. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/4/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 9/18/2019. Replies due by 9/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Motion to Stay, #2 Proposed Order)(Weissenberger, Emily) (Filed on 9/4/2019)
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byJohnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.. (Weissenberger, Emily) (Filed on 8/30/2019)
August 28, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/15/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/22/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2019)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/9/2019. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2019)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings Pursuant to Local Rule 3-13 by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Weissenberger, Emily) (Filed on 8/23/2019) Modified on 8/28/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Weissenberger, Emily) (Filed on 8/23/2019)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Action; Demand for Jury Trial from San Francisco County Superior. Their case number is CGC-19-577699. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0971-13644165). Filed by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Emily Weissenberger In Support of Removal, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C)(Weissenberger, Emily) (Filed on 8/23/2019) Modified on 8/28/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joseph v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Michael F. Healy
Represented By: Amanda Villalobos
Represented By: Michael Carl Zellers
Represented By: Emily Weissenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.
Represented By: Emily Weissenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Emily Weissenberger
Represented By: Michael F. Healy
Represented By: Amanda Villalobos
Represented By: Michael Carl Zellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audrey Joseph
Represented By: Amanda D. McGee
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Lenze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?