Reynolds v. Apple Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Larry Reynolds
Defendant: Apple Inc. and Google LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv05440
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:504
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #24 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Olena V. Ripnick-O'Farrell. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2019) Modified on 10/25/2019 (cl, COURT STAFF). The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 10/25/19 a copy of this order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing.
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #23 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to A. John P. Mancini. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2019) Modified on 10/25/2019 (cl, COURT STAFF). The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 10/25/19 a copy of this order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing.
October 25, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Google LLC ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13826290.) filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Ripnick-O'Farrell, Olena) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
October 25, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Google LLC ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13826083.) filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Mancini, A. John) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 AMENDED ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/24/19. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2019) Modified on 10/25/2019 (cl, COURT STAFF). The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 10/25/19 a copy of this order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing.
October 24, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google LLC re #20 Certificate of Interested Entities, #19 Certificate of Interested Entities (Buccigross, Graham) (Filed on 10/24/2019)
October 24, 2019 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Google LLC identifying Corporate Parent Alphabet Inc., Corporate Parent XXVI Holdings Inc. for Google LLC. (Buccigross, Graham) (Filed on 10/24/2019)
October 24, 2019 Filing 19 Certificate of Interested Entities by Google LLC identifying Corporate Parent Alphabet Inc., Corporate Parent XXVI Holdings Inc. for Google LLC. (Buccigross, Graham) (Filed on 10/24/2019)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint . Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/24/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (cl, COURT STAFF).
October 23, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Google LLC of re #16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, re #15 Notice of Appearance (Buccigross, Graham) (Filed on 10/23/2019)
October 23, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of A. John P. Mancini, #2 Proposed Order)(Buccigross, Graham) (Filed on 10/23/2019)
October 23, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Graham Marc Buccigross for Defendant Google LLC (Buccigross, Graham) (Filed on 10/23/2019)
October 23, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. re #11 MOTION to Dismiss COMPLAINT UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6); MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS, #13 Statement, #10 Notice of Appearance, #9 Notice of Appearance, #12 Request for Judicial Notice, (Durham, Gina) (Filed on 10/23/2019)
October 23, 2019 Filing 13 DEFENDANT APPLE INC.'S CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS filed by Apple Inc.. (Durham, Gina) (Filed on 10/23/2019)
October 23, 2019 Filing 12 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of re #11 MOTION to Dismiss COMPLAINT UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6); MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT filed by Apple Inc.. (Related document(s) #11 ) (Durham, Gina) (Filed on 10/23/2019)
October 23, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss COMPLAINT UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6); MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/5/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 11/6/2019. Replies due by 11/13/2019. (Durham, Gina) (Filed on 10/23/2019)
October 23, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Stanley Joseph Panikowski for Defendant Apple Inc. (Panikowski, Stanley) (Filed on 10/23/2019)
October 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Gina Louise Durham for Defendant Apple Inc. (Durham, Gina) (Filed on 10/23/2019)
October 3, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed Apple Inc. served on 10/2/2019, answer due 10/23/2019; Google LLC served on 10/2/2019, answer due 10/23/2019. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2019)
October 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Receipt re #6 Summons Issued. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2019)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Apple Inc., Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 USM-285 Forms) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Copyright Infringement. (cc: form mailed to register). (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2019)
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/28/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/5/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2019)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Larry Reynolds. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2019)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against Apple Inc., Google LLC (Filing fee IFPP). Filed by Larry Reynolds. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reynolds v. Apple Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Stanley Joseph Panikowski
Represented By: Gina Louise Durham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google LLC
Represented By: A. John P Mancini
Represented By: Olena Vera Ripnick-O'Farrell,
Represented By: Graham Marc Buccigross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?