Melo v. Frida Kahlo Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Cristine Melo
Defendant: Frida Kahlo Investments, SA and Frida Kahlo Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv05449
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION to Extend Defendants' Time to Respond to Amended Declaratory Judgment Complaint filed by Frida Kahlo Corporation, Frida Kahlo Investments, SA. (Agarwal, Monty) (Filed on 9/30/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Cristine Melo. Frida Kahlo Corporation and Frida Kahlo Investments, S.A. served on 9/9/19, answer due 9/30/19. (Lamkin, Rachael) (Filed on 9/10/2019) Modified on 9/11/2019 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
September 4, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Trademark Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint)(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2019)
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Entities by Cristine Melo (Lamkin, Rachael) (Filed on 8/30/2019)
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 Civil Cover Sheet by Cristine Melo . (Lamkin, Rachael) (Filed on 8/30/2019)
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 Amended Complaint Summons Issued as to Frida Kahlo Corporation, Frida Kahlo Investments, SA. (mclS, COURT STAFF)
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 11/29/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/6/2019 08:30 AM. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2019)
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Charles R. Breyer. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2019)
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Lamkin, Rachael) (Filed on 8/30/2019)
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Frida Kahlo Corporation, Frida Kahlo Investments, SA. Filed byCristine Melo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Lamkin, Rachael) (Filed on 8/30/2019)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Frida Kahlo Corporation, Frida Kahlo Investments, SA ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13662327.). Filed byCristine Melo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Lamkin, Rachael) (Filed on 8/29/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Melo v. Frida Kahlo Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frida Kahlo Investments, SA
Represented By: Monty Agarwal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frida Kahlo Corporation
Represented By: Monty Agarwal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cristine Melo
Represented By: Rachael Dauphine Lamkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?