Javitch v. BrandRep LLC
Plaintiff: Mark L. Javitch
Defendant: BrandRep LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv05451
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Telephone Consumer Protection Act (TCPA)
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of all Defendants under Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) by Mark L. Javitch (Javitch, Mark) (Filed on 12/12/2019)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #11 Stipulation to continue case management conference. Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/12/2019. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 12/19/2019 at 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2019)
November 26, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue CMC filed by Mark L. Javitch. (Javitch, Mark) (Filed on 11/26/2019)
September 23, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION to Extend Defendant's Responsive Deadline until October 8, 2019 filed by Mark L. Javitch. (Javitch, Mark) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 23, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mark L. Javitch.. (Javitch, Mark) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mark L. Javitch.. (Javitch, Mark) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 9/30/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark L. Javitch. BrandRep LLC served on 9/3/2019, answer due 9/24/2019. (Javitch, Mark) (Filed on 9/3/2019)
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to BrandRep LLC. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2019)
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/28/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/5/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2019)
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/12/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2019)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Javitch, Mark) (Filed on 8/29/2019)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BradRep LLC (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13662402). Filed by Mark L. Javitch. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Javitch, Mark) (Filed on 8/29/2019) Modified on 8/30/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Javitch v. BrandRep LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BrandRep LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark L. Javitch
Represented By: Mark Louis Javitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?