United States of America v. Benson et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Elizabeth Benson, Contra Costa County Treasurer, Belarus Investments Limited and USAA Federal Savings Bank
Case Number: 3:2019cv05454
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Hixson
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Contra Costa County Treasurer re #12 Answer to Complaint (Hooley, Rebecca) (Filed on 10/21/2019)
October 21, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint byContra Costa County Treasurer. (Hooley, Rebecca) (Filed on 10/21/2019)
September 17, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States of America.. (Matchison, Amy) (Filed on 9/17/2019)
September 4, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Belarus Investments Limited, Elizabeth Benson, Contra Costa County Treasurer, USAA Federal Savings Bank. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2019)
September 3, 2019 Filing 9 Proposed Summons. (Matchison, Amy) (Filed on 9/3/2019)
September 3, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. (Matchison, Amy) (Filed on 9/3/2019)
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. (Matchison, Amy) (Filed on 9/3/2019)
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. (Matchison, Amy) (Filed on 9/3/2019)
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Matchison, Amy) (Filed on 9/3/2019)
September 3, 2019 #Electronic filing error. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety with Defendants' names and addresses Re: #2 Proposed Summons f iled by United States of America (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2019)
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/28/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/5/2019 10:00 AM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2019)
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/13/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2019)
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Matchison, Amy) (Filed on 8/30/2019)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byUnited States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Matchison, Amy) (Filed on 8/30/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Benson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Benson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contra Costa County Treasurer
Represented By: Rebecca Jeanenne Hooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belarus Investments Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Federal Savings Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Amy Talburt Matchison
Represented By: David L. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?