Brady v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Shirley Brady
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv05566
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: re 3:16-md-02741-VC; District of Minnesota, 0:19-cv-02307-MJD-SER Brady v. Monsanto Company, opened in California Northern District as 3:19-cv-05566-VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 149 cc: JPMDL (wsnS-adi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:19-cv-02307. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-149) transferring case to the Northern District of California per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge Vince Chhabria. (kt)
August 28, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (lmb)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company. filed by Shirley Brady. Filer requests summons issued. (Johnson, Charles)
August 21, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (KDS)
August 21, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis per 3rd/4th Civil Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Please use case number 19-cv-2307 MJD/SER. (KDS)
August 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7094906) filed by Shirley Brady. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Johnson, Charles) Modified text on 8/21/2019 (KDS).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brady v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Brady
Represented By: Charles H Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?